SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, KEVIN J. DOYLE, FRANK A. MAXSON, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, THOMAS LAMARTINA, CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, DAVID HUERTA, EDWARD J. MANKO and LAPHONZA BUTLER
Defendant: NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC. D/B/A ANTIOCH CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., TRANQUILITY, INC. D/B/A SAN MIGUEL VILLA, TRANQUILITY, INC. and NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03005
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; TRANQUILITY, INC. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019 (Bardes, Diana)
December 21, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. (zad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC., TRANQUILITY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a magistrate judge for full case management up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a magistrate judge, beginning immediately; the magistrate judge will be randomly assigned by the clerk's office; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/21/18. (DJS)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC. D/B/A ANTIOCH CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, TRANQUILITY, INC. D/B/A SAN MIGUEL VILLA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5849322) filed by THOMAS LAMARTINA, DAVID HUERTA, RODERICK S. BASHIR, EDWARD J. MANKO, LAPHONZA BUTLER, EMANUEL PASTREICH, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, KEVIN J. DOYLE, FRANK A. MAXSON, CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN J. DOYLE
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ALBRECHT
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAPHONZA BUTLER
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC. D/B/A ANTIOCH CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONE TREE CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANQUILITY, INC. D/B/A SAN MIGUEL VILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANQUILITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORCAL CARE CENTERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?