BUCHANAN v. SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC. et al
Plaintiff: MOREH J. BUCHANAN and RAY BABY
Defendant: SONY ATV MUSIC, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, WARNER MUSIC GROUP and UNIVERSAL PICTURES
Case Number: 1:2018cv03028
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Summons (5) Issued as to SONY ATV MUSIC, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UNIVERSAL PICTURES, WARNER MUSIC GROUP. (zmd)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/05/2019. (lckbj1)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2019. (lckbj1)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2019. (lckbj1)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
January 16, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: 4616096293. (zsb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION requesting Appointment of Counsel by MOREH J. BUCHANAN (zmd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MOREH J. BUCHANAN (zmd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SONY ATV MUSIC, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UNIVERSAL PICTURES, WARNER MUSIC GROUP with Jury Demand filed by MOREH J. BUCHANAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (zmd)
December 19, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/19/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCHANAN v. SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY ATV MUSIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MUSIC GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL PICTURES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOREH J. BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY BABY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?