BAUER et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: F. SCOTT BAUER and JEFFREY T. CLARK
Defendant: SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK, N.A., CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv03047
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, until 1 March 2019 by CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK, N.A., FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK, N.A., FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION (Dagger, Kelly)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK, N.A., FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION (Shipley, Curtis)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Sun, Jr on behalf of CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION (Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Bond on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Bond, Erik)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JEFFREY T. CLARK, F. SCOTT BAUER. CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; CAPITAL BANK, N.A. waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; WINSTON 23 CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Graebe, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/16/19. (lcrjl3)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL BANK, N.A., FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC, WINSTON 23 CORPORATION, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,,, filed by JEFFREY T. CLARK, F. SCOTT BAUER. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by F. SCOTT BAUER, JEFFREY T. CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Graebe, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5852454) filed by JEFFREY T. CLARK, F. SCOTT BAUER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1: 2016 09 09 Bauer and Clark Part 359 Application, #2 Exhibit #2: 10.18.16 Letter, #3 Exhibit #3: 10.24.16 Letter, #4 Exhibit #4: 11.23.16 Letter, #5 Exhibit #5: Final Agency Determination, #6 Exhibit #6: Order, #7 Exhibit #7: 9.6.12 Letter, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons FDIC, #10 Summons Southern Community Financial Corporation, #11 Summons Southern Community Financial, LLC, #12 Summons Southern Community Bank and Trust, #13 Summons Winston 23 Corporation, #14 Summons Capital Bank Corporation, #15 Summons Capital Bank Financial Corporation, #16 Summons Capital Bank, N.A., #17 Summons First Horizon National Corporation, #18 Summons First Tennessee Bank National Association)(Graebe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUER et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Erik Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN COMMUNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL BANK FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN COMMUNITY BANK AND TRUST
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL BANK CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINSTON 23 CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. SCOTT BAUER
Represented By: Christopher T. Graebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY T. CLARK
Represented By: Christopher T. Graebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?