TOLENTINO v. TARGET CORPORATION
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MARGARITA TOLENTINO
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv03060
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Kohler, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 INTERROGATORIES Propounded by VICTORIA MARGARITA TOLENTINO.(Kohler, William)
January 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Witness List due by 2/5/2019. The parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by 2/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 3/29/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/27/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. (znbn)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Exhibit A Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/31/2019. (lcjeb1)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The parties shall exchange witness lists by February 5, 2019; (2) The parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by February 19, 2019; (3) The parties shall join any other party and amend their pleadings, and the Plaintiff shall provide her Rule 26(a)(2) Statements by March 29, 2019; (4) Target shall provide its Rule 26(a)(2) statements by May 27, 2019; and (5) Discovery (except for the filing of Requests of Admissions) shall close on June 21, 2019. A post-discovery status hearing is scheduled for June 24, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/31/2019. (lcjeb1)
January 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2019. Scheduling Order forthcoming. Post Discovery Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (znbn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Lanier on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION (Lanier, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan)
January 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for January 31, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3 prior to that date. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/11/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #2 Notice of Removal (zsb)
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA Sheet Correcting Omission of full residence by TARGET CORPORATION #1 Notice (Other) filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Huber, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TARGET CORPORATION (Huber, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 First ANSWER to Complaint by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 007874 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5854268 filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Huber, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORPORATION (Huber, Jonathan) Modified on 12/21/2018 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLENTINO v. TARGET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MARGARITA TOLENTINO
Represented By: William L. Kohler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Represented By: Daniel R. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?