UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $1,478,991.75 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $1,478,991.75 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC and $1,478,991.74 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC
Claimant: MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03124
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified Claim by Maritime Assistance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Claim of Maritime Assistance LLC)(Sullivan, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case randomly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg as the case was not related to an earlier filed case. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem Issued Electronically. (zmd)
December 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
December 31, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Assigned was entered in error and will be directly assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar Kotelly. (zmd)
December 31, 2018 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) Modified on 12/31/2018 (zmd).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-1779. (Faruqui, Zia)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Faruqui, Zia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $1,478,991.75 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,478,991.75 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,478,991.74 OF FUNDS IN THE NAME OF MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Zia Mustafa Faruqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MARITIME ASSISTANCE LLC
Represented By: William M. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?