ELEE v. EHEALTH AFRICA
Plaintiff: OLIVIA ELEE
Defendant: EHEALTH AFRICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv03152
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY by EHEALTH AFRICA. (Frederick, James)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/03/2019. (lcapm2)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by EHEALTH AFRICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, James)
July 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's discovery is extended until July 26, 2019. In the future, the parties need to ask leave of court to extend discovery due dates, except the discovery deadline itself. See the Order, ECF No. 13, issued on April 23, 2019, for further information. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/7/2019. (lcapm2) Modified document type on 7/8/2019 (zjd).
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery by EHEALTH AFRICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EHEALTH AFRICA. Attorney Bethany M. Gullman terminated. (Gullman, Bethany)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Albert Frederick on behalf of EHEALTH AFRICA (Frederick, James)
April 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures due by 5/21/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendments of Pleadings due by 6/14/2019. Proponent Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 8/2/2019. Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 8/20/2019. Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. Discovery shall conclude 12/13/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting a schedule for further proceedings in this matter: the parties shall exchange initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before May 21, 2019; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendments of pleadings is June 14, 2019; proponent expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made no later than August 2, 2019; rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made on or before August 20, 2019; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before September 13, 2019; all discovery shall conclude on December 13, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for December 17, 2019, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/23/2019. (lcapm2)
April 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Nicole A. Truso and Daniel E. Pulliam are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/19/2019. (lcapm2)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Sara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel E. Pulliam, :Firm- Faegre Baker Daniels LLP, :Address- 300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700, Indianapolis, IN 46204-1750. Phone No. - (317) 237-0300. Fax No. - (317) 237-1000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6047468. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EHEALTH AFRICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel E. Pulliam in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Defendant eHealth Africa's [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Admission of Attorney Daniel E. Pulliam Pro Hac Vice)(Gullman, Bethany)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole A. Truso, :Firm- Faegre Baker Daniels LLP, :Address- 2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South 7th Street, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 766-7000. Fax No. - (612) 766-1600 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6047448. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EHEALTH AFRICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole A. Truso in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Defendant eHealth Africa's [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Admission of Attorney Nicole A. Truso Pro Hac Vice)(Gullman, Bethany)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rani V. Rolston on behalf of OLIVIA ELEE (Rolston, Rani)
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. An Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter is set for April 23, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/15/2019. (lcapm2)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EHEALTH AFRICA.(Gullman, Bethany)
February 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/14/2019. (zjd)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due on or before March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/22/2019. (lcapm2)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EHEALTH AFRICA (Gullman, Bethany)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EHEALTH AFRICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gullman, Bethany)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany M. Gullman on behalf of EHEALTH AFRICA (Gullman, Bethany)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EHEALTH AFRICA served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019 (McDonough, Sara)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EHEALTH AFRICA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EHEALTH AFRICA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5863814) filed by OLIVIA ELEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McDonough, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELEE v. EHEALTH AFRICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHEALTH AFRICA
Represented By: Bethany M. Gullman
Represented By: Nicole A. Truso
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: James Albert Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVIA ELEE
Represented By: Sara N. McDonough
Represented By: Rani V. Rolston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?