USA v. STONE Featured Case
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: ROGER JASON STONE, JR.
Case Number: 1:2019cr00018
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER J. STONE, JR. On February 19, 2019, the Court ordered the defendant to show cause at a hearing to be held on February 21, 2019 as to why the media communications order entered in this case 36 and/or defendant's conditions of release 21 should not be modified or revoked. A hearing was held on this date. For the reasons set forth on the record, and based upon the entire record, including the sealed exhibit to the hearing 42 , the testimony of the defendant, the arguments of counsel, and the submissions of the parties 28 29 filed in connection with the potential imposition of a media communications order, the Court entered the following order at the hearing: the conditions of defendant's pretrial release 21 are hereby modified to include the condition that, and the February 15, 2019 media communications order 36 is hereby modified to provide that, the defendant is prohibited from making statements to the media or in public settings about the Special Counsel's investigation or this case or any of the participants in the investigation or the case. The prohibition includes, but is not limited to, statements made about the case through the following means: radio broadcasts; interviews on television, on the radio, with print reporters, or on internet based media; press releases or press conferences; blogs or letters to the editor; and posts on Facebook, Twitter, Instagram, or any other form of social media. Furthermore, the defendant may not comment publicly about the case indirectly by having statements made publicly on his behalf by surrogates, family members, spokespersons, representatives, or volunteers. The order to show cause is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/19. (DMK)
February 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Evidentiary Hearing as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. held on 2/21/2019. For the reasons stated on the record in open Court, The 36 Media Communications Order and the 21 Amended Order Setting Conditions of Release are modified. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond with additional Amended Conditions; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Bruce S. Rogow, Robert Buschel, L. Peter Farkas and Grant J. Smith; US Attorneys: Jonathan Ian Kravis, Michael Marando, Jeannie S. Rhee and Aaron Jon Zelinsky; Witness: Roger J. Stone, Jr.; Court Exhibits: One (Exhibit A) admitted under seal. (jth)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Government's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Addendum as to ROGER J. STONE JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the government's sealed addendum to response to defendant's objection to notice of designation of pending related criminal case [39-1], and exhibit A to the addendum [39-2]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/19/19. (DMK)
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR: Show Cause Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER J. STONE, JR. Defendant is ORDERED to show cause at a hearing to be held on Thursday, February 21, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. as to why the media contact order entered in this case 36 and/or his conditions of release 21 should not be modified or revoked in light of the posts on his Instagram account on or about February 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/19/19. (DMK)
February 18, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Apology by ROGER JASON STONE, JR (Buschel, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR (1). With respect to 31 defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause, the government must provide the Court with information concerning the precise timing and content of the "press release from SCO" referred to in [31-1] defendant's Exhibit 1, if any, along with any other information it wishes to submit in response to the motion, by February 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2018. (lcabj3)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR (1). Upon consideration of 27 Defendant's Objections to the Notice of Related Case and 37 the government's Response, the Court will take no action with respect to the current assignment of this case, which is consistent with Local Criminal Rule 57.12. The Court also notes that any future request that the Court take action must be in the form of a motion that comports with Local Criminal Rule 47. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2019. (lcabj3)
February 15, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE by USA as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR re 27 Notice (Other), Response to Defendant's Objection to Notice of Designation of Pending Related Case (Marando, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR (1) pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.7(b),(c). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2019. (lcabj3)
February 15, 2019 Filing 35 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF of Dr. Jerome Corsi as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(zvt)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file [32-1] the Amici Curiae Brief, [32-2] Exhibit A, and [32-3] Exhibit B on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/15/19. (DMK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit text messages with counsel & reporter, # 2 Exhibit draft copy sealed indictment, # 3 Exhibit Metadata screen shot AAW, # 4 Exhibit Timeline for morning of Jan 25, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 34 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis has been ruled on as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. re 33 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (zvt)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. re February 1, 2019 MINUTE ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File by Movant David Christenson. "File as Notice of Appeal, Leave to file granted" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on February 12, 2019. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachment: # 1 Attachments)(zvt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. "Leave to file granted" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on February 12, 2019. (Attachments: # 1 Amici Curiae Brief of Dr. Jerome Corsi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(zvt)
February 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR: The government shall respond to defendant's 27 Objection to the Notice of Related Case by 2/15/2019. (jth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by USA as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR Regarding Imposition of Order Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.7(c) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kravis, Jonathan)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. It is ORDERED that the government shall respond to defendant's 27 Objection to the Notice of Related Case by February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/8/19. (DMK)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by ROGER JASON STONE, JR to Court's order on "gag order" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Portion of transcript Feb 1 status conference)(Buschel, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Objection to Notice of Designation of Pending Related Criminal case by ROGER JASON STONE, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Designation of Related case, # 2 Exhibit DOJ press release, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 26 government's sealed motion to seal witness list as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under seal 26 government's motion and [26-1] its attachment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/19. (DMK) Modified on 2/8/2019 to reflect that the Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under seal 26 "government's" not "defendant's" motion and [26-1] its attachment. (jth).
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on January 29, 2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 9. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 2/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019.(Jones, Cathryn)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds that the case is "so complex... that it is unreasonable to expect adequate preparation for pretrial proceedings or for the trial itself within the time limits" of the speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(ii), and that the interests of justice would be served by excluding "the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence." 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). Therefore, it is ORDERED that the case is designated complex; the time between the entry of this order and the next scheduled hearing in this matter on March 14, 2019 will be excluded from the speedy trial act calculation; the ends of justice will be served by doing so; and this action outweighs the interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/1/2019.(jth)
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 1, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance: February 1, 2019. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 2/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/01/2019. (jth)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Appearance Bond).(jth)
February 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. held on 2/1/2019. The government's 18 Motion for Protective Order governing discovery will be granted. Case will be designated as Complex 19 . Submissions from either party pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.7(c) are due by 2/8/2019. Another Status Conference is set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains on Personal Recognizance Bond with Amended Conditions (see Order for details); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Robert C. Buschel and Tara A. Campion; US Attorneys: Michael John Marando, Jonathan Ian Kravis, Jeannie Sclafani Rhee and Aaron Jon Zelinsky. (jth)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 20 Motion for Leave to File as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1). Movant David Christenson has filed a motion for leave to file a motion to intervene in this case. His motion for leave to file, which the Court docketed on the official public record, did not attach the intervention motion itself; it simply transmitted copies of similar motions filed in other cases. But his motion for leave to file any request to intervene will be DENIED because the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure do not provide for intervention in a criminal case. Also, since movant not a party to these proceedings, it is FURTHER ORDERED that no additional submissions from the movant will be docketed in this case. THIS IS A FINAL, APPEALABLE ORDER. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/1/19. (DMK)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Declare Case Complex and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marando, Michael) Modified event on 2/4/2019 (znmw).
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery by USA as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zelinsky, Aaron)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Intervene as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. "File as Motion for Leave to file a Motion to Intervene; File 1st 2 pages only" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 01/30/2019. (zvt) Modified filed date on 2/1/2019 (znmw).
January 30, 2019 Attorneys: Bruce S. Rogow and Tara A. Campion added to this case for defendant ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Pro Hac Vice Motions granted on 1/30/2019) (jth)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 16 17 Motions for Leave of Bruce S. Rogow and Tara A. Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1) only upon condition that at the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/30/19. (DMK)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tara A. Campion. :Address- 100 NE 3rd Avenue, Suite 1000, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301. Phone No. - 954-767-8909. Fax No. - 954-764-1530 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5917225. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Tara A. Campion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farkas, L.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bruce S. Rogow. :Address- 100 NE 3rd Ave., Ste. 1000 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301. Phone No. - 954-767-8909. Fax No. - 954-764-1530 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5917156. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bruce S. Rogow, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farkas, L.)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR: The Status Conference presently set for 2/1/2019 at 1:30 PM is reset for 2/1/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. The status conference presently set in Courtroom 3 for 2/1/2019 at 1:30 PM is reset for 2/1/2019 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/19. (DMK)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Appearance Bond) (zcal)
January 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Arraignment as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1): Count 1,2-6, and 7 held on 1/29/2019. Not Guilty Plea as to all counts. The Government is not opposed to the Release of Defendant, to include special conditions. Status Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Released on Personal Recognizance/ Release Issued; Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones; Time Frame: Ctrm 3 [11:00 - 11:13]; Defense Attorney: Grant Smith and Robert Bushel; Special Counsel: Aaron Zelinsky and Jeannie Rhee; US Attorneys: Jonathan Kravis and Michael Marando; Pretrial Officer: Christine Schuck. (zcal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 Arrest Warrant as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR Returned Executed on 1/25/2019 in Southern District of Florida - Fort Lauderdale. (zcal)
January 29, 2019 Arrest of ROGER JASON STONE, JR on 1/25/2019 in Southern District of Florida - Fort Lauderdale. (zcal)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Grant J. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/29/2019. (lcdar3)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert C. Buschel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/29/2019. (lcdar3)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Grant J. Smith. :Address- 401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-120, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301. Phone No. - (954) 328-9064. Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Receipt No.: 4616096484 by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Buschel. :Address- One Financial Plaza, Suite 1300, 100 S.E. Third Avenue, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394. Phone No. - (954) 530-5301. Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Receipt No.: 4616096484. by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: L. Peter Farkas appearing for ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (zvt)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: This court has reviewed the declaration filed as an attachment to the pending Motion for Admission of Robert Buschel 9 , and the declaration filed as an exhibit to the pending Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Grant J. Smith 10 . This court has determined that neither Mr. Buschel nor Mr. Smith, in his declaration, set forth "(4) a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline[.]" Local Criminal Rule 44.1(d). Additionally, this court has observed that L. Peter Farkas, Esq., whose name appears on the signature line of each motion, neither filed the motions nor entered his appearance; instead, the motions were filed by the non-member attorneys. Thus, these non-member attorneys failed to comply with Local Civil Rule 44.1(c)(1), which permits non-member attorneys to file papers in this Court "only if such [non-member] attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court[]" (emphasis supplied). For these reasons, it is ORDERED that both motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The attention of these non-member attorneys is directed to the 9:00 a.m. deadline for compliance with the cited Local Criminal Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/28/2019. (lcdar3)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Grant J. Smith. :Address- gsmith@strategysmith.com. Phone No. - 954-328-9064. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5912217. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Grant Smith, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Buschel. :Address- 100 S.E. Third Avenue, Suite 1300, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394. Phone No. - 954-530-5301. Fax No. - 954-320-6932 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5912100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert Buschel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On January 25, 2019, this court scheduled arraignment for 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 29, 2019. Thereafter, two lawyers, neither of whom is a member of the Bar of United States District Court for the District of Columbia, each filed a "NOTICE OF APPEARANCE" "as permanent counsel[,]" and included the notation "Pro hac vice pending" beneath the signature line. As of the filing of the instant Minute Order, neither lawyer has complied with Local Criminal Rule 44.1(d), which requires, in pertinent part, that "[a]ny [non-member] seeking to appear pro hac vice must file a motion signed by a sponsoring member of the Bar of this Court," accompanied by the prescribed declaration and fee. See also Local Civil Rule 44.1(c)(1) (providing that "[a]n attorney who is a member in good standing of the bar of any United States Court or of the highest court of any State, but who is not a member of the Bar of this Court, may file papers in this Court only if such attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court."). It is hereby ORDERED that if the two lawyers expect to "be heard in open court" at the proceedings scheduled for tomorrow, then they shall fully comply with Local Civil Rule 44.1(d) by 9:00 a.m. tomorrow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/28/2019. (lcdar3) Modified on 1/29/2019 (zcal).
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR from from United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida in Ft. Lauderdale, Florida. Case Number 0:19-mj-6039 (hsj)
January 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Grant J. Smith appearing for ROGER JASON STONE, JR (Smith, Grant)
January 25, 2019 Arrest of ROGER JASON STONE, JR in Southern District of Florida. (hsj)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert C. Buschel appearing for ROGER JASON STONE, JR (Buschel, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Set Hearings as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR: ARRAIGNMENT scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 29, 2019 in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (zcal)
January 25, 2019 Case unsealed pursuant to 3 Order filed on 01/24/2019 as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (zvt)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to ROGER JASON STONE JR. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 01/24/2019. (zvt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to ROGER JASON STONE, JR (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7. (zvt) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/25/2019 with the original Indictment that has counsel's signature) (zad). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/31/2019, because of missing page numbers 6,13,16, and 18 (zad).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Aaron Simcha Jon Zelinsky
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Michael John Marando
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Represented By: Lawrence Rush Atkinson
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER JASON STONE, JR.
Represented By: L. Peter Farkas
Represented By: Bruce S. Rogow
Represented By: Grant J. Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Represented By: Tara A. Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?