DUN et al v. TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: PAT RUGGIERI, SHERYL DUN, DORA MENGEL, IRENE DUN and WILLIAM DUN
Defendant: AMPACE INSURANCE AGENCY, AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES, FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES, DOES I-V, TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and BUENA SOMBRA INSURANCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 89 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES.(Leventhal, Markham)
March 6, 2019 Filing 88 Amended ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint by AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES.(Leventhal, Markham)
March 6, 2019 Filing 87 Amended ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint by TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Leventhal, Markham)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney Shaunda A. Patterson-Strachan is terminated. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/28/2019. (lcjeb2)
February 28, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Shaunda Patterson-Strachan by AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES, FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES, TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Patterson-Strachan, Shaunda)
February 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Answer due by 3/6/2019. First Phase of Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. Further Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (lsj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendants may file an Amended Answer by March 6, 2019; (2) Both sides may engage in the first phase of discovery (which may include depositions) through June 14, 2019; (3) The parties shall file a joint status report by June 19, 2019; and (4) The parties shall return for a further status hearing to discuss additional discovery and/or dispositive motions on June 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/2019. (lcjeb2)
February 14, 2019 Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/2019. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (lsj)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #84 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of TODD M. FULLER. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/5/2019. (lcjeb2)
February 4, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Todd M. Fuller, :Firm- Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A., :Address- 100 S.E. Second Street, Suite 4200, Miami, FL 33131. Phone No. - 305-530-0050. Fax No. - 305-530-0055 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5926680. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES, FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES, TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Fuller in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Leventhal, Markham)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LAWRENCE ALAN ANDERSON. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #82 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DANIEL PATRICK BUCKLEY. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 22, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lawrence A. Anderson, :Firm- Anderson Law Office, :Address- 4th Street North, P.O. Box 2608, Great Falls, MT 59403. Phone No. - 406-727-8466. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5900584. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IRENE DUN, SHERYL DUN, WILLIAM DUN, DORA MENGEL, PAT RUGGIERI (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anderson)(Salb, Micah)
January 22, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Buckley, :Firm- Buckley Law Office, :Address- 125 W Mendenhall St., Ste 201, Bozeman, MT 59715. Phone No. - (406) 587-3346. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5900583. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IRENE DUN, SHERYL DUN, WILLIAM DUN, DORA MENGEL, PAT RUGGIERI (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Buckley, #2 Declaration of Anderson)(Salb, Micah)
January 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' #81 Motion and ORDERS that the status hearing set for January 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESET for February 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/16/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 15, 2019 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Order "Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Status Conference" by AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES, FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES, TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Leventhal, Markham); Modified event on 1/17/2019 (tth).
January 9, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing on January 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/9/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 8, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Salb on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Salb, Micah)
January 8, 2019 Filing 79 Case transferred in from District of Montana; Case Number 2:16-cv-00023. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying #62 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to transfer this matter to the Federal District Court of the District of Columbia (Doc. #58 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/2/2019. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT on referral to magistrate for settlement conference by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company Notice by Defendant Transamerica Premier Regarding Personal Jurisdiction (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 75 MINUTE ENTRY for MOTION HEARING held 10/4/18 before Judge Brian Morris: Dan Buckely and Lawrence Anderson appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs, Mark Leventhal and Marshall Mickelson appearing on behalf of Defendants. This hearing is with regard to #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. filed by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC filed by Sheryl Dun, Irene Dun, William Dun. Parties with argument. Court will issue Order. Parties are to file a joint status report by October 10 as to whether or not a settlement conference is requested. Hearing commenced at 1:30 p.m. and concluded at 3:10 p.m. (Court Reporter J. DeLong.) (Law Clerk: D. Frank), (Hearing held in Great Falls) (MMS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun, Dora Mengel, Pat Ruggieri re #73 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Salb, S.) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney S. Micah Salb for Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun, Dora Mengel, and Pat Ruggieri. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2018. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Remark: #71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #58 Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C., termed as moot. Reply filed as Doc. #72 . (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. filed by Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun. (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Time Extension Lawrence A. Anderson appearing for Plaintiffs Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order [Proposed]) (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun. (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC filed by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement and Declaration of Trust, #2 Exhibit B - Policy and Certificate Filing in Wash. D.C., #3 Exhibit C - Group Policy No. MP02633, #4 Exhibit D - Marketing Materials for NHC-3260-0801, #5 Exhibit E - Enrollment Form signed by Irmadel Dunn, #6 Exhibit F - Group Accidental Death Certificate, #7 Exhibit G - November 17, 2010 letter from Monumental Life, #8 Exhibit H - Aug. 26, 2011 Letter from Monumental, #9 Exhibit I - Apr. 12, 2013 Letter from Monumental) (Leventhal, Markham) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #58 MOTION to Transfer to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/11/2018. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER Re-Setting Hearing on Motion #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc., #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion Hearing is RESET for 10/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/10/2018. (SLL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. Declaration of Mary J. Tresnak in support of Financial Palnning Services motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by Financial Planning Services. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. Declaration of Mary J. Tresnak in support of Aegon Direct Marketing Services motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by AEGON Direct Marketing Services. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 63 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. filed by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Marketing Materials, #2 Exhibit B Enrollment Form, #3 Exhibit C Group Accidental Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D Agreement and Declaration of Trust, #5 Exhibit E Group Policy, #6 Exhibit F Policy and Cert. filing in Wash. D.C., #7 Exhibit G 11/17/10 Letter from Monumental Life, #8 Exhibit H 8/26/11 Letter from Monumental Life, #9 Exhibit I 4/12/13 Letter from Monumental Life) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Defendants Financial Planning Services, Inc. and Aegon Direct Marketing Services Inc. Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Text ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants Motion to Dismiss is due September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/31/2018. (SLL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to dismiss and brief in support for lack of personal jurisdiction Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 59 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC filed by Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun. (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Transfer to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Federal District Court in Washington, D.C. Federal District Court in Washington, DC Lawrence A. Anderson appearing for Plaintiffs Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION S. Micah Salb to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2187164.) Lawrence A. Anderson appearing for Plaintiffs Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Salb Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pls' Mtn Lv To Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER amending June 19, 2018, Order. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/15/2018. (ASG) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion to Amend and Clarify the Court's June 19, 2018, Order Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment with supporting brief on or before September 3, 2018. Response brief due on or before September 21, 2018. Hearing on Defendants' motion for summary judgment set on October 4, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthouse in Butte, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/19/2018. (NOS) (Modified to attach Order; NEF regenerated.)(NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 53 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/19/2018. (Law Clerk: B. Hammer), (SLL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference on Tuesday, June 19, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. with Judge Brian Morris. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/18/2018. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED: Defendants Buena Sombra Insurance Agency, Inc., and Ampac Insurance Agency, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/27/2018. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Buena Sombra Insurance Agency and Ampac Insurance Agency Without Prejudice Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff William Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel B. Bidegaray terminated. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/21/2018. (ASG) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel B. Bidegaray appearing for Plaintiff William Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bidegaray, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve. Plaintiffs shall have until March 27, 2017, in which to accomplish service on Buena Sombra Insurance Agency and Ampac Insurance Agency. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/2/2018. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants Buena Sombra Ins. and Ampac Ins. Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff William Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company re #42 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Patterson-Strachan, Shaunda) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company re #42 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Leventhal, Markham) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 43 Letter to attys re ECF Registration w/copy of Order granting PHV. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for AEGON Direct Marketing Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Financial Planning Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company.; granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for AEGON Direct Marketing Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Financial Planning Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint Defendant Financial Planning Services, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Financial Planning Services. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 40 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint Defendant AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by AEGON Direct Marketing Services. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION Shaunda Patterson-Strachan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2019286.) Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shaunda Patterson-Strachan, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION Markham R. Leventhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2019285.) Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendants AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Markham Leventhal, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark R. Hensley on behalf of AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Hensley, Clark) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshal L. Mickelson on behalf of AEGON Direct Marketing Services, Financial Planning Services, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs shall have until December 27, 2017 in which to accomplish service on Buena Sombra Insurance Agency and Ampac Insurance Agency. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/27/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve re #23 Summons Issued, #21 Amended Complaint Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff William Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Second Amended Complaint and Summons served on Aegon Direct Marketing Services, Inc. on September 8, 2017, filed by William Dun. (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel B. Bidegaray (Bidegaray, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint Defendant Transamerica's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to AEGON Direct Marketing Services. Original and 3 copies to cnsl for service. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint and Summons served on Financial Planning Services, Inc. on 8/10/17, filed by William Dun. (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by William Dun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Vacating Scheduling Order (Doc 16). The Court will conduct a scheduling conf at a date and time after the Amended Complaint has been filed. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/11/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT and Uncontested Request to Vacate Scheduling Order by Irene Dun. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to vacate current Scheduling Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 25 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT Order Re-Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 4/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/19/2017. (SLL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Ampace Insurance Agency, Buena Sombra Insurance Agency, Financial Planning Services. (Originals to cnsl for service) (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anderson, Lawrence) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by William Dun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2017. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Upon Motion by the Plaintiffs, good cause shown therein, and no objection from Defendants, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The parties shall have until June 30, 2017 in which to amend pleadings. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/22/2017. (SLL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #3 Complaint, Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Irene Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amendment of Pleadings and Joinder of Parties to 6/9/17. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amendment of Pleadings and Joinder of Parties Daniel B. Bidegaray appearing for Plaintiffs Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun, Dora Mengel, Pat Ruggieri (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bidegaray, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Motions due by 2/2/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2018.Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/17/2017. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear at the preliminary pretrial conference by conference call. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for February 16, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Great Falls, MT, shall be held by telephone. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in information. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/9/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear via conference call Unopposed Motion to Hold Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Conference Call Marshal L. Mickelson appearing for Defendant Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Enrollment Form, #2 Exhibit B - Specimen Copy of Certificate) (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Irene Dun. (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The preliminary pretrial conference set or 2/8/17 is VACATED and RESET for Thursday, February 16, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse. The Court will entertain a motion for the parties to appear at the preliminary pretrial conference by telephone. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/26/2017. (ELL) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 26, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Irene Dun (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/1/2017. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/1/2017. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/1/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/24/2017. (ELL) Modified on 1/25/2017 to correct the date that the Judge signed the Order (ELL). [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
January 13, 2017 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing Preliminary Pretrial Conference Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Irene Dun (Buckley, Daniel) Modified on 1/25/2017 to term motion (ELL). [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
September 16, 2016 Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun, Dora Mengel, Pat Ruggieri. (Bidegaray, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by William Dun. (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 19, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 18, 2016 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company, filed by William Dun, Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, Pat Ruggieri, Dora Mengel. (Originally filed with Montana 18th Judicial District Court, Gallatin County as DV-15-982B on 12/11/15) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B) (ELL, ) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 18, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Case Register Report (ELL, ) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 13, 2016 Filing fee PAID: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-1776588. (SMS, ) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]
May 13, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Premier Insurance Company from Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-15-982B, filed by Transamerica Premier Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commissioner Ltr and State Ct Pldgs, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet) (SMS, ) [Transferred from Montana on 1/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUN et al v. TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAT RUGGIERI
Represented By: Micah Salb
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERYL DUN
Represented By: Micah Salb
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORA MENGEL
Represented By: Micah Salb
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE DUN
Represented By: Micah Salb
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DUN
Represented By: Micah Salb
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPACE INSURANCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGON DIRECT MARKETING SERVICES
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Represented By: Todd M. Fuller
Represented By: Shaunda A. Patterson-Strachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL PLANNING SERVICES
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Represented By: Shaunda A. Patterson-Strachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Represented By: Shaunda A. Patterson-Strachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUENA SOMBRA INSURANCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?