SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al

Plaintiff: SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL for the U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH and HUMAN SERVICES and OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2019. (tb)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 3/26/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/19. (DJS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Field, Brian)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/19. (Nash, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Nash, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2019 (Nash, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/19. (Nash, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Nash, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2019 (Nash, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (ztd)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nash, Stephen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (zmd)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5877340) filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1., #5 Summons US Department of Health and Human Services, #6 Summons Office of Inspector General for the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Nash, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL for the U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH and HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?