DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 3/14/2019 (lsj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/14/2019. (lcrcl3)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Nebeker, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/15/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Morse, Josephine)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5882168) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Morse, Josephine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?