BUZZFEED, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Plaintiff: BUZZFEED, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hair, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUZZFEED, INC.. Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated. (Schafer, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC. (Topic, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2019. (hmc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/22/2019. (lctnm3)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hair, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hair, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA (Date of Receipt of Summonses) by BUZZFEED, INC. #5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, #6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (Schafer, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/23/2019 (Schafer, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2019. (Schafer, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2019. (Schafer, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Schafer, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/15/2019. (lctnm3)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
January 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5884664) filed by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Geidner Request, #2 Exhibit B - Geidner Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit C - Tillman Request, #4 Exhibit D - Tillman Acknowledgment, #5 Exhibit E - DEO Correspondence, #6 Exhibit F - JMD Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Subsequent JMD Correspondence, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Schafer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUZZFEED, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUZZFEED, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Schafer
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?