CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. COHEN et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Center for Immigration Studies filed a civil RICO lawsuit against Defendants Richard Cohen and Heidi Beirich, who operate the Southern Poverty Law Center, alleging that SPLC's designation of CIS as a hate group constitutes wire fraud and racketeering.

Plaintiff: CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Defendant: RICHARD COHEN and HEIDI BEIRICH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 7 8 Motions for Leave of Howard Foster and Matthew Galin to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/4/19. (DMK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Galin, :Firm- Foster PC, :Address- 150 N. Wacker Drive. Phone No. - 312-726-1600. Fax No. - 866-470-5738 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5923749. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Matthew Galin)(Axelrod, Julie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Howard Foster, :Firm- Foster PC, :Address- 150 N. Wacker Drive. Phone No. - 312-726-1600. Fax No. - 866-470-5738 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5923735. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Howard Foster)(Axelrod, Julie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RICHARD COHEN served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019 (Axelrod, Julie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HEIDI BEIRICH served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019 (Axelrod, Julie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to HEIDI BEIRICH, RICHARD COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Complaint by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Axelrod, Julie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5888934) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Richard Cohen, # 3 Summons Heidi Beirich)(Axelrod, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. COHEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI BEIRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Represented By: Julie B. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?