PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP et al v. ACOSTA et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by two public health groups to block the Trump Administration amendment of an Obama-era rule which requires most employers to electronically submit detailed reports of all workplace injuries to the Department of Labor each year.

Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION and COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION and R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Referring Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the parties' #13 Motion for Scheduling Order and setting a schedule for further proceedings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/25/2019. (lctjk2)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order in Related Cases by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baer, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly as related. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #11 Defendants' Unopposed Notice of Related Cases, the Court concludes that this case is related, under Local Rule 40.5(a), to Public Citizen Health Research Group v. Acosta, No. 18-cv-1729, an earlier case filed before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Both cases involve the same plaintiffs and defendants, substantially similar challenges to the same OSHA rulemaking, and substantially similar requests for relief. The two cases thus "grow out of the same event" and their disposition is likely to "involve common issues of fact." LCvR 40.5(a)(3). Accordingly, as dictated by Local Rule 40.5(c)(2), it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this matter to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for reassignment to Judge Kelly as related to No. 18-cv-1729. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 28, 2019. (lcrc3)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 18-1729. (Baer, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hendry Baer on behalf of All Defendants (Baer, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION served on 2/5/2019 (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA served on 2/1/2019 (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/04/2019. (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 2/1/2019 (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2019. (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marcy Zieve on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zieve, Allison)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS, PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5906972) filed by COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS, PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Acosta, #3 Summons to DOL, #4 Summons to OSHA, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2019) (zef, ).
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5906972) filed by COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS, PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Acosta, # 3 Summons to DOL, # 4 Summons to OSHA, # 5 Summons Attorney General, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP et al v. ACOSTA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNCIL OF STATE AND TERRITORIAL EPIDEMIOLOGISTS
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: Michael Hendry Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?