JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. ORTIZ et al
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: Frank Ortiz, Michael Romeo Rehman and INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Michael Romeo Rehman filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Frank Ortiz filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC (znmw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT INNER CIRCLE 1223 D/B/A DIRTY MARTINI by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Attesting service)(Hollimon, Justin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. as to FRANK ORTIZ. (Hollimon, Justin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. as to MICHAEL ROMEO REHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Due Diligence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Photograph)(Hollimon, Justin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form GN-6 Service of Process Form, #2 Exhibit Transmittal Letter to Superintendent of Corporations, #3 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Service of Process Upon Inner Circle1223, LLC, #4 Exhibit DC Gov Entity Information, #5 Exhibit Mailing label and postage to Inner Circle 1223, LLC, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hollimon, Justin)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 Amended Complaint was entered in error and refiled by counsel. (See Docket Entry #11 to view document)(jf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined complaint)(Hollimon, Justin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. (Hollimon, Justin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jf).
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC. (jf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE INNER CIRCLE 1223 D/B/A DIRTY MARTINI filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Disclosure of Financial Interest against All Defendants filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 2/11/2019 (zjf).
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jf).
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jf).
February 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #6 Amended Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct docket event (jf)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re #5 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as one complete docket entry. Should counsel need assistance with e-filing contact the ECF Help Desk @ (202) 354-3190. (jf)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. (Hollimon, Justin) Modified event title on 2/4/2019 (znmw).
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FRANK ORTIZ, MICHAEL ROMEO REHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank Ortiz, Michael Romeo Rehman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5914287) filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hollimon, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/30/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Justin Michael Hollimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Romeo Rehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?