CLERMONT v. SOOTER et al
Plaintiff: EMIL CLERMONT
Defendant: JAKE FERRER, RICCARDO MARTINEZ, DEVIN COOPER, ARTHUR STEINBERG, JAMES BRITIAH KRELL, SKYLAR DEFFINBAUGH, AMY EBENAL, JASON HENTZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, JEAN CLERMONT, ALLEN SCHURBERT, ANDY ANORBES, BILL ELFO, TERRY BROWN, DAVE HOLT, WILLIAM MCCOOL, JUSTIN FARMER, MIKE MUNDEN, TERRY LEWIS, RANDELL NORTON, KELLY LINVILLE, JAY INSLEE, JOE HART, BRAD GLICKSON, TIM RICHARDSON, BONNIE ONION, BRENT GREEN, SUSAN SOOTER, SIMMONS SWEENEY SMITH, MARY THIELER, MIKE PENCE, JEFF LEGHORN, ELIZABETH FARMER, JENNY DURKIN, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE, REGGIE B. WALTON, RONAYE TAYLOR, TAMMIK KELSON, DORIEN STEPHENS, DANIEL PARSONS, CRAIG MCLAUGHLIN, RYAN KING, MELLANIA PULLAR, COLIN GOOGEN, PAUL BILLING, RACHEL BAUMAN, GEORGE BUSH, BONNIE ONOON, DONALD J. TRUMP and JON LANDIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Referring Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's #16 Notice of change of address it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's address of record be changed to the address listed in his Notice, notwithstanding General Civil Filing Requirements Section E(1). It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall change the plaintiff's address of record to the address in his notice and shall mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff at his new address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 5, 2019. (lcdlf3)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by EMIL CLERMONT. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 4/4/2019. (tth)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Saxon on behalf of KELLY LINVILLE (Saxon, Matthew)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss **for Failure to State a Claim** by MELLANIA PULLAR, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Meyer, Sarah)
April 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: was entered in error at the request of counsel. Said pleading will be refiled by counsel. (tth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell J. Pope on behalf of MELLANIA PULLAR, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE (Pope, Russell)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss **for Failure to State Claim** by MELLANIA PULLAR, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Meyer, Sarah); Modified on 4/2/2019 (tth).
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Meyer on behalf of MELLANIA PULLAR, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE (Meyer, Sarah)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by ANDY ANORBES, DEVIN COOPER, SKYLAR DEFFINBAUGH, AMY EBENAL, JAKE FERRER, BRAD GLICKSON, BRENT GREEN, JASON HENTZ, TAMMIK KELSON, RYAN KING, JON LANDIS, MIKE MUNDEN, BONNIE ONION, BONNIE ONOON, TIM RICHARDSON, ALLEN SCHURBERT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from EMIL CLERMONT. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 3/26/2019. (tth)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from EMIL CLERMONT dated 3/13/2019. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 3/25/2019. (tth)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from EMIL CLERMONT "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 3/25/2019. (tth)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER pursuant to Fox v. Strickland, 837 F.2d 507 (D.C. Cir. 1988). See order for details. The plaintiff's opposition to Paul Billing's motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2019. (JK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich; Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PAUL BILLING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's #2 Motion for recusal is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is returned to the Calendar Committee for random reassignment. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 28, 2019. (lcrbw1)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Recusal by EMIL CLERMONT (ztd)
February 7, 2019 Summons (49) Issued as to ANDY ANORBES, RACHEL BAUMAN, PAUL BILLING, TERRY BROWN, GEORGE BUSH, JEAN CLERMONT, DEVIN COOPER, SKYLAR DEFFINBAUGH, JENNY DURKIN, AMY EBENAL, BILL ELFO, ELIZABETH FARMER, JUSTIN FARMER, JAKE FERRER, BRAD GLICKSON, COLIN GOOGEN, BRENT GREEN, JOE HART, JASON HENTZ, DAVE HOLT, JAY INSLEE, TAMMIK KELSON, RYAN KING, JAMES BRITIAH KRELL, JON LANDIS, JEFF LEGHORN, TERRY LEWIS, KELLY LINVILLE, RICCARDO MARTINEZ, WILLIAM MCCOOL, CRAIG MCLAUGHLIN, MIKE MUNDEN, RANDELL NORTON, BONNIE ONION, BONNIE ONOON, DANIEL PARSONS, MIKE PENCE, MELLANIA PULLAR, TIM RICHARDSON, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE, DONALD RUMSFELD, ALLEN SCHURBERT, SIMMONS SWEENEY SMITH, SUSAN SOOTER, ARTHUR STEINBERG, DORIEN STEPHENS, RONAYE TAYLOR, MARY THIELER, DONALD J. TRUMP, REGGIE B. WALTON. (ztd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDY ANORBES, RACHEL BAUMAN, PAUL BILLING, TERRY BROWN, GEORGE BUSH, JEAN CLERMONT, DEVIN COOPER, SKYLAR DEFFINBAUGH, JENNY DURKIN, AMY EBENAL, BILL ELFO, ELIZABETH FARMER, JUSTIN FARMER, JAKE FERRER, BRAD GLICKSON, COLIN GOOGEN, BRENT GREEN, JOE HART, JASON HENTZ, DAVE HOLT, JAY INSLEE, TAMMIK KELSON, RYAN KING, JAMES BRITIAH KRELL, JON LANDIS, JEFF LEGHORN, TERRY LEWIS, KELLY LINVILLE, RICCARDO MARTINEZ, WILLIAM MCCOOL, CRAIG MCLAUGHLIN, MIKE MUNDEN, RANDELL NORTON, BONNIE ONION, BONNIE ONOON, DANIEL PARSONS, MIKE PENCE, MELLANIA PULLAR, TIM RICHARDSON, ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE, DONALD RUMSFELD, ALLEN SCHURBERT, SIMMONS SWEENEY SMITH, SUSAN SOOTER, ARTHUR STEINBERG, DORIEN STEPHENS, RONAYE TAYLOR, MARY THIELER, DONALD J. TRUMP, REGGIE B. WALTON ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616096646) with Jury Demand filed by EMIL CLERMONT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLERMONT v. SOOTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKE FERRER
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICCARDO MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVIN COOPER
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BRITIAH KRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKYLAR DEFFINBAUGH
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY EBENAL
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HENTZ
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD RUMSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEAN CLERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN SCHURBERT
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDY ANORBES
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL ELFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCCOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE MUNDEN
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDELL NORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY LINVILLE
Represented By: Matthew M. Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY INSLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD GLICKSON
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM RICHARDSON
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE ONION
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT GREEN
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN SOOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMMONS SWEENEY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY THIELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE PENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF LEGHORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNY DURKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO ROJAS-VEGE
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Meyer
Represented By: Russell J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGGIE B. WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONAYE TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMIK KELSON
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORIEN STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN KING
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELLANIA PULLAR
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Meyer
Represented By: Russell J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLIN GOOGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL BILLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL BAUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE BUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE ONOON
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON LANDIS
Represented By: Robert N. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMIL CLERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?