SIMS v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Clifton David Sims seeks a declaratory judgment that Defendants Donald J. Trump and the United States of America infringed on his First Amendment rights by having the Trump campaign file an arbitration claim against him for purported breach of a non-disclosure agreement in regards to his book "Team of Vipers: My 500 Extraordinary Days in the Trump White House."

Plaintiff: Clifford David Sims and CLIFTON DAVID SIMS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00345
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2019. (Moss, Bradley)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/12/19. (DM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2-12-2019. (lcckk3)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of CLIFFORD DAVID SIMS (Moss, Bradley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Leave to Use Counsel's Address in Violation of Local Rule 5.1(e) by CLIFFORD DAVID SIMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5941048) filed by CLIFFORD DAVID Sims. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Donald J. Trump, #3 Summons - United States of America, #4 Summons - AG, #5 Summons - US Attorney)(Zaid, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5941048) filed by Clifford David Sims. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons - Donald J. Trump, # 3 Summons Summons - United States of America, # 4 Summons Summons - AG, # 5 Summons Summons - US Attorney)(Zaid, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMS v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford David Sims
Represented By: Bradley Prescott Moss
Represented By: Mark Steven Zaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFTON DAVID SIMS
Represented By: Bradley Prescott Moss
Represented By: Mark Steven Zaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?