RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC et al v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE OF RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC, RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. and SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00371
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint re #10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(Williams, Joel) Modified on 3/27/2019 to add docket link (jf).
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Selective Insurance Company Of America Response To The Amended Complaint by 3/27/2019. (mac)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant Selective Insurance Company of America shall respond to the amended complaint by no later than March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2019. (lcegs2)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Kahn, Alexander)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. (Mahar, Jennifer)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Craig Harrison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harrison, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeremy Wyatt, #2 Statement of Facts Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeremy Wyatt, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Statement of Facts Statement of Disputed Facts)(Harrison, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Redline Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Harrison, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC (Harrison, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/21/19. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (Mahar, Jennifer)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mahar, Jennifer)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Kahn, Alexander)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Downing Gilliss on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Gilliss, David)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 000131 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5945531 filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC et al v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE OF RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Adam Craig Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICH MOE ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Adam Craig Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Adam Craig Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mahar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Downing Gilliss
Represented By: Alexander B. Kahn
Represented By: Joel Peter Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?