US WHOLESALE LLC v. EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE)
Plaintiff: US WHOLESALE LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE)
3Rd Party Defendant: MCDEVITT & SONS PLUMBING & HEATING. INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00400
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE) by MCDEVITT & SONS PLUMBING & HEATING. INC.. Related document: #10 Third Party Complaint filed by EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE). (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party Counter Claim)(Grant, Alex)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MCDEVITT & SONS PLUMBING & HEATING. INC. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019 (Snyder, Scott)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Albert S. Nalibotsky shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/21/2019. (lctnm2)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Albert S. Nalibotsky, :Firm- Saltz Nalibotsky, :Address- 6805 Morrison Boulevard, Suite 470, Charlotte, NC 28211. Phone No. - 704-910-2680. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6013726. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by US WHOLESALE LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rego, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MCDEVITT & SONS PLUMBING & HEATING. INC.. (znmw)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for April 9, 2019, is hereby rescheduled for April 25, 2019, at 10 am in Courtroom 2. Once the Third-party Defendant enters an appearance and files its answer, the parties are ordered to follow the instructions outlined in the Court's March 11, 2019, Order. ECF No. #8 . The parties shall meet and confer as soon as practicable and discuss each of the matters set forth in LCvR 16.3(c). It is further ordered that the parties shall submit their Joint Statement addressing all topics listed in LCvR 16.3(c) no later than fourteen (14) days following their meet and confer, or seventy-two (72) hours prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference, whichever is earlier in time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/18/2019. (lctnm2) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit original hearing date (hmc).
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against McDevitt & Sons Plumbing & Heating, Inc. filed by EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer)(Snyder, Scott)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE) served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Rego, John)
March 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for April 9, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/11/2019. (lctnm2)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE) (Snyder, Scott)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE).(Snyder, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by US WHOLESALE LLC (Rego, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by US WHOLESALE LLC. (Rego, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/15/2019. (lctnm2)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE). (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5951285) filed by US WHOLESALE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rego, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US WHOLESALE LLC v. EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: EDENS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (DE)
Represented By: Scott E. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US WHOLESALE LLC
Represented By: John Alexander Rego
Represented By: Albert S. Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MCDEVITT & SONS PLUMBING & HEATING. INC.
Represented By: Alex M. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?