FOTOHAUS, LLC v. ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS LLC and FOTOHAUS, LLC
Defendant: ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH and ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00424
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/9/2019. (lckbj1)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5956177) filed by FOTOHAUS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Deal, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOTOHAUS, LLC v. ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED PLAN FOR HEALTH, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS LLC
Represented By: David C. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS, LLC
Represented By: David C. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?