WOODLAND v. WILKIE et al
Plaintiff: TONYA D. WOODLAND
Defendant: HEATHER FRAZIER, CHARLES FASELIS, CRYSTAL DAY, MICHAEL BROWNE, WARREN E. FOSTER, JR and ROBERT L. WILKIE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00448
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint on or before April 15, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate this case. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2019. (lcrdm3, )
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/15/2019. (kt)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint, Dkt. #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an amended complaint consistent with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(b)(6) on or before April 15, 2019. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2019. (lcrdm3, )
March 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/12/2019. (zsb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TONYA D. WOODLAND (zef, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by TONYA D. WOODLAND.(zef, )
February 22, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 02/22/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODLAND v. WILKIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES FASELIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYSTAL DAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BROWNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN E. FOSTER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA D. WOODLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?