TALBOT v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: GARY TALBOT
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00470
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
March 22, 2019 Cases associated. All filings in these consolidated cases should be made only in Civil Case No. 17-1997. (See Court's Minute Order filed on 3/22/2019) (jf)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Davis, Alison)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 consent motion to consolidate. This matter is hereby consolidated with U.S. ex rel. Talbot v. Nat'l R.R. Passenger Corp, Civil Action No. 17-1997. The Court, finding that the two cases involve common issues of fact and grow out of the same event or transaction, and the parties having no opposition to consolidation, hereby consolidates the two cases pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All filings in these consolidated cases should be made only in Civil Case No. 17-1997. The parties shall make no additional filings in Civil Case No. 19-470 and the Clerk of the Court is directed to close Case No. 19-470. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/22/2019. (lcegs2)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by GARY TALBOT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ren, Nina)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/05/19. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GARY TALBOT. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1997. (zef, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5965854) filed by GARY TALBOT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases Pending In This Court)(Ren, Nina) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALBOT v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Represented By: Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY TALBOT
Represented By: Nina Yuanyuan Ren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?