CLARKE v. BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: WESLEY L. CLARKE
3Rd Party Plaintiff: BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: ESTATE OF JAMES MCBEE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00577
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial disclosures due by 6/3/2019. Motions for joinder due by 6/10/2019. Proponent expert disclosures due by 8/5/2019. Opponent expert disclosures due by 8/26/2019. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 9/9/2019. Fact discovery closes on 10/7/2019. Joint post-discovery status report due by 10/18/2019. (zcdw)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #9 Joint Discovery Plan and Proposed Scheduling Order, it is ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: initial disclosures shall be exchanged on or before June 3, 2019; any motions for joinder shall be filed on or before June 10, 2019; proponent expert disclosures shall be served on or before August 5, 2019; opponent expert disclosures shall be served on or before August 26, 2019; any rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made on or before September 9, 2019; and fact discovery shall close on October 7, 2019. The parties shall then submit a post-discovery joint status report on or before October 18, 2019 that advises the Court (a) whether the parties request referral for mediation or settlement; (b) whether dispositive motions are anticipated and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule; or (c) whether the parties request a date for a pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 22, 2019. (lcdlf2)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 Meet and Confer Statement by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(White, William); Modified event on 4/22/2019 (tth).
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim #4 by WESLEY L. CLARKE. (tth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 filed by Estate of James McBee by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY.(White, William)
March 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 4/19/2019. (zcdw)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall confer in accordance with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 and file, on or before April 19, 2019, a joint meet and confer report as set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After receiving the joint meet and confer report, the Court will set a scheduling conference unless the Court determines, on the basis of the report, that a conference is unnecessary. See Local Civil Rule 16.4. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 29, 2019. (lcdlf2)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM, , COUNTERCLAIM against BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY, WESLEY L. CLARKE by ESTATE OF JAMES MCBEE. Related document: #4 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM, filed by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY.(Bunn, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (1) Issued as to ESTATE OF JAMES MCBEE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Wesley Clarke, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against ESTATE OF JAMES MCBEE, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against WESLEY L. CLARKE by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit)(White, William)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
March 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY (White, William)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 Lit 000004 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5976371 filed by BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to District of Columbia Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARKE v. BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: William H. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY L. CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ESTATE OF JAMES MCBEE
Represented By: Robert Phillip Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?