MELENDEZ v. VERGARA

Petitioner: CARLOS MELENDEZ
Respondent: RAFAEL VERGARA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00696
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerk's Office shall direct the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service of the Petition on Respondent. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/13/2019. (lcjeb1)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for further consideration. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 3/8/2019. (pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 3/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt AUG025773. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 3/13/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Compliance due by 3/12/2019. (pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 3/13/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Carlos Melendez.(pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 3/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELENDEZ v. VERGARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CARLOS MELENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RAFAEL VERGARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?