SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST v. BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST
Defendant: RACHEL PARK, A BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC. and BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00745
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC (jf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT for Entry of Default by Clerk of Court by SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Misken, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2019 docket text/event (jf).
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; RACHEL PARK served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019 (Misken, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST as to BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC., RACHEL PARK. (Misken, Kenneth)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Rachel Park (Misken, Kenneth)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to A BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC., RACHEL PARK. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (zef, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC., RACHEL PARK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6005293) filed by SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons to A Bloomin' Sandwich Cafe, Inc., #8 Summons to Rachel Park, #9 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Misken, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST v. BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMIN' SANDWICH CAFE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNH MEDICAL OFFICE PROPERTIES TRUST
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Misken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?