JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Petitioner: DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00800
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2019. (tb)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report #16 , it is hereby ordered that he parties shall file another joint report by 8/14/19 and every 60 days thereafter. The report shall include a proposed order if the report contains a proposed production or briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/12/19. (DJS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2019. (tb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joints status report #13 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/13/19. (DJS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File Denied." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/10/19. (ztd) Modified to add fiat on 6/17/2019 (znmw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File Denied." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/10/19. (ztd) (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/17/2019) (ztd). Modified to add fiat on 6/17/2019 (znmw).
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis; and Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File DENIED." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/29/19. (ztd) Modified to add fiat on 6/3/2019 (znmw).
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Parties Joint Status Report and Proposed Order are due by 6/14/2019. (jth)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MIUTE ORDER: Granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Joint Status and proposed order due June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/28/19. (DJS)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie)
May 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/30/2019. (tb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 5/30/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/10/19. (DJS)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's motion for leave to file a critical example of why I should prevail on behalf of you, your family, all American and Mankind This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/19. (ztd)
April 9, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5091 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (zrdj)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's motion for leave to memorandum concerning my 20-year exercise in futility, or maybe not This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/19. (ztd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #6 Notice of Appeal. (ztd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-4)(ztd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: David Christenson's motion #4 to intervene is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/2/19. (DJS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (ztd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015747) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Fedeli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Chris Fedeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?