IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. VOSS PATTERN COMPANY
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER, IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND and HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Defendant: VOSS PATTERN COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the #5 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 9, 2019. (lcrbw1)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Shiffrin, Joshua)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw1)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #3 Summons Returned Executed; emailed to jshiffrin@bredhoff.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do Not Refile. FYI: In the future, do not select, All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. You must select the parties served. (ztd, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. VOSS PATTERN COMPANY, served 3/26/19, answer due 4/16/19 (Shiffrin, Joshua) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (ztd).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to VOSS PATTERN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VOSS PATTERN COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015896) filed by IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND, HENRY C. EICKELBERG, PHILIP J. GRUBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shiffrin, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. VOSS PATTERN COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOSS PATTERN COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?