FOLSON v. ANTONELLI
Petitioner: GREGORY FOLSON
Respondent: B. M. ANTONELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv00820
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/08/2019. (zmc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case by GREGORY FOLSON (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See order for details. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY FOLSON (zsb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GREGORY FOLSON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(zsb)
March 22, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/22/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOLSON v. ANTONELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GREGORY FOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. M. ANTONELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?