EVANS et al v. MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN C. CHEEKA, KEDRICK EVANS, JOHN F. MAKLE, WASHINGTON SPRINKLER CORPORATION, INC. and JOHN C. CHEEKS
Defendant: ANTONIO PARRETTA, PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, JAMES TROILO, MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., RICHARD HOLOWCHAK, RICK, JIM and MICHAELS BUILDING CO. LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00878
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 9, 2020. (lccjn3)
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Defendants James Triolo, Antonio Parretta and Richard Holowchak by JOHN F. MAKLE. (Bell, Lisa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #26 MOTION to Enforce filed by RICHARD HOLOWCHAK, ANTONIO PARRETTA, JAMES TROILO. (Scotti, Brian)
April 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause Order due by 5/12/2020. (zcdw)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of Plaintiff Makle's #26 Motion to Enforce Settlement Against Defendants James Troilo, Antonio Parretta, and Richard Holowchak, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before May 12, 2020, Individual Defendants shall show cause as to why the Motion should not be treated as conceded. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 28, 2020. (lccjn3)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by JOHN F. MAKLE (Bell, Lisa) Modified event on 4/9/2020 (znmw).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #24 and #25 Stipulations of Dismissal, it appears to the Court that Plaintiff Makle has stipulated that this action may be dismissed only as to the Corporate Defendants. Makle does not address whether this action may be dismissed as to Individual Defendants James Troilo, Antonio Parretta, Richard Holowchak. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before April 6, 2020, Plaintiff Makle shall file a stipulation of dismissal as to the Individual Defendants or indicate whether he intends to respond to Defendants' #9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2020. (lccjn3)
March 27, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal by WASHINGTON SPRINKLER CORPORATION, INC.. (Harbin, Lawrence)
March 20, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Michaels Development Co., Inc., Michaels Development Holding Company, L.L.C., Prestige Building Co., L.L.C. (Bell, Lisa)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' #22 and #23 Status Reports, in which the Parties indicated they may have arrived at settlements, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before March 20, 2020, the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the Court as to whether the settlements have been executed and if the Parties will be voluntarily dismissing the matter, or, if not, how they intend to proceed. It is further ORDERED that the previously entered stay in this matter is extended to April 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 11, 2020. (lccjn3)
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2020. (zcdw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by JOHN F. MAKLE. (Bell, Lisa)
December 21, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by KEDRICK EVANS. (Harbin, Lawrence)
December 11, 2019 Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. (zcdw)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' #21 Third Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Conclusion of Mediation, in which the Parties represented that they "will soon be in a posture for dismissal," and considering that the Parties requested the proceedings be stayed no later than October 21, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The proceedings are stayed until December 20, 2019. On or before December 20, 2019, the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the Court as to whether the Parties have agreed to a resolution, and if not, how they intend to proceed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 11, 2019. (lccjn3)
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions by KEDRICK EVANS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harbin, Lawrence)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by KEDRICK EVANS. (Harbin, Lawrence)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KEDRICK EVANS . (Harbin, Lawrence)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by KEDRICK EVANS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harbin, Lawrence)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2019. (zcdw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' #18 Second Consent Motion to Further Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) the proceedings are stayed until October 7, 2019; and (2) on October 7, 2019, the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report, updating the Court on the status of the mediation and providing their recommendations for how the case should proceed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 28, 2019. (lccjn1, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Adam Scotti (Scotti, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Annette Bell on behalf of JOHN F. MAKLE (Bell, Lisa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KEDRICK EVANS . (Harbin, Lawrence)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plainitiff John F. Makle by KEDRICK EVANS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harbin, Lawrence) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (ztd).
July 8, 2019 Case Stayed. (zcdw)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion to Stay further Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. The parties shall complete mediation by 8/21/2019. These proceedings are stayed until 8/28/2019, at which time the parties shall notify the Court of the results of mediation. If mediation does not resolve the litigation, (i) the time for all parties to respond to discovery, whether served at this time or not, shall be governed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and LCvR 26.2 and (ii) the time for Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (either by way of Opposition or amended pleading), shall be extended to twenty-one (21) days after concluding mediation. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 7/8/2019. (zcdw)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff John F. Makle. Lawrence Harbin and Harbin & Hein PLLC are hereby withdrawn from representing Plaintiff John F. Makle. New counsel must enter an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff John F. Makle. If no appearance is entered within 10 days, plaintiff John F. Makle shall provide the Court with an address and telephone number for receiving all communications regarding this litigation. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 7/8/2019. (zcdw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to further Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by KEDRICK EVANS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harbin, Lawrence) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
June 26, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Mediation: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/29/19. (lcrc1)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by KEDRICK EVANS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Oder, #2 Exhibit Stipulation)(Harbin, Lawrence); Modified event and text on 5/1/2019 (tth).
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shameka N. Bloyce on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Katherine C. Ondeck (Bloyce, Shameka)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., ANTONIO PARRETTA, PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, JAMES TROILO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scotti, Brian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Adam Scotti on behalf of All Defendants (Scotti, Brian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JOHN F. MAKLE, JOHN C. CHEEKS, KEDRICK EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract, #2 Exhibit Letter 041018, #3 Exhibit Letter 032118, #4 Exhibit Letter 052518, #5 Exhibit Letter 092218, #6 Exhibit Letter 092818, #7 Exhibit Email 09182018 Holowchak, #8 Exhibit Appln for payment)(Harbin, Lawrence)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by RICHARD HOLOWCHAK, MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., ANTONIO PARRETTA, PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, JAMES TROILO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ondeck, Katherine)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an initial responsive pleading by April 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 28, 2019. (lcrc2)
March 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file an initial responsive pleading by April 10, 2019.(tj)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC (Ondeck, Katherine)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC (Ondeck, Katherine)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC. (Ondeck, Katherine)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District of Columbia Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 001059 B (Fee Status:Paid $400; Receipt Number: 0090-6026120 ) filed by PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, JAMES TROILO, RICHARD HOLOWCHAK, ANTONIO PARRETTA, MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ondeck, Katherine) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add receipt number for payment filing fee (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS et al v. MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN C. CHEEKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEDRICK EVANS
Represented By: Lawrence Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. MAKLE
Represented By: Lawrence Harbin
Represented By: Lisa Annette Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON SPRINKLER CORPORATION, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN C. CHEEKS
Represented By: Lawrence Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO PARRETTA
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESTIGE BUILDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES TROILO
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DEVELOPMENT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAELS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD HOLOWCHAK
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAELS BUILDING CO. LLC
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Shameka N. Bloyce
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?