PARKS et al v. FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. SIMONS and LAWRENCE H. PARKS
Defendant: F. DANIEL SICILIANO, GREG SEIBLY, JOHN F. LUIKART, JOHN F. ROBINSON, JULIA YOUNG, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, KEVIN MURRAY, JEFFREY K. BALL, FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, JOAN OPP, DWIGHT ALEXANDER, MARANGAL DOMINGO, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, MELINDA GUZMAN, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN T. WASLEY and SCOTT C. SYPHAX
Case Number: 1:2019cv00883
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE Regarding Service of Process by JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Spaziano, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG. (Davis, Alison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Joinder to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG by DWIGHT ALEXANDER re #25 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Johnson, Barbara)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit to Seibly Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Seibly Declaration)(Davis, Alison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion of the Director Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY. (Spaziano, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodora Rochelle Lee on behalf of FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (Lee, Theodora) (Main Document 23 replaced on 6/10/2019) (ztth).
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #14 Notice (Other) Response to Joinder of Dwight Alexander filed by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS. (Brown, Carla)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion of the Director Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of WALLACE C. DOOLITTLE is GRANTED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/2019. (lcjeb3)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 ERRATA by DWIGHT ALEXANDER #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wallace C. Doolittle, :Firm- Law Offices of Wallace C. Doolittle, :Address- 580 California Street, 12th Floor. Phone No. - 415-568-2249. Fax No. - 415-634-1303 Filing fee $ filed by DWIGHT ALEXANDER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wallace C. Doolittle, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Barbara)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO (Davis, Alison)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wallace C. Doolittle, :Firm- Law Offices of Wallace C. Doolittle, :Address- 580 California Street, 12th Floor. Phone No. - 415-568-2249. Fax No. - 415-634-1303 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6135323. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DWIGHT ALEXANDER (Johnson, Barbara)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Joinder by DWIGHT ALEXANDER re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dwight Alexander)(Johnson, Barbara)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion of the Director Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) by JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley Beal, #2 Declaration of Brian Riley, #3 Declaration of Craig Blunden, #4 Declaration F. Daniel Siciliano, #5 Declaration Jeffrey Ball, #6 Declaration of Joan Opp, #7 Declaration of John Luikart, #8 Declaration of John Robinson, #9 Declaration of John Wasley, #10 Declaration of Kevin Murray, #11 Declaration of Marangal Domingo, #12 Declaration of Melinda Guzman, #13 Declaration of Robert Nielson, #14 Declaration of Scott Syphax, #15 Declaration Simone Lagomarsino, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaziano, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzan Abebe on behalf of JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Abebe, Suzan)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KAREN L. CORMAN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/2019. (lcjeb3)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen Leili Corman, :Firm- Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, :Address- 300 South Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-687-5208. Fax No. - 213-621-5208 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6083958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaziano, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison N. Davis on behalf of FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, GREG SEIBLY, JULIA YOUNG (Davis, Alison)
April 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/20/2019. (znbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 20, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/15/2019. (lcjeb3)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaziano, Jennifer); Modified event on 4/15/2019 (tth).
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Spaziano on behalf of JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, CRAIG G. BLUNDEN, MARANGAL DOMINGO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY (Spaziano, Jennifer)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CRAIG G. BLUNDEN. (Attachment #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, Summons Not Issued filed by TIMOTHY L. SIMONS, LAWRENCE H. PARKS. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TIMOTHY L. SIMONS, LAWRENCE H. PARKS, Summons Not Issued.(Brown, Carla)
March 29, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to CRAIG G. BLUNDEN. (zef, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (18) Issued Electronically as to DWIGHT ALEXANDER, JEFFREY K. BALL, BRADLEY W. BEAL, MARANGAL DOMINGO, FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, MELINDA GUZMAN, SIMONE LAGOMARSINO, JOHN F. LUIKART, KEVIN MURRAY, ROBERT F. NIELSEN, JOAN OPP, BRIAN M. RILEY, JOHN F. ROBINSON, GREG SEIBLY, F. DANIEL SICILIANO, SCOTT C. SYPHAX, JOHN T. WASLEY, JULIA YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Page 20 (Signature to Complaint) by LAWRENCE H. PARKS, TIMOTHY L. SIMONS #1 Complaint, filed by TIMOTHY L. SIMONS, LAWRENCE H. PARKS. (Brown, Carla)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028039) filed by TIMOTHY L. SIMONS, LAWRENCE H. PARKS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Brown, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKS et al v. FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. DANIEL SICILIANO
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG SEIBLY
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Theodora Rochelle Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. LUIKART
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. ROBINSON
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA YOUNG
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Theodora Rochelle Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY W. BEAL
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG G. BLUNDEN
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MURRAY
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY K. BALL
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL HOME LOAN BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Theodora Rochelle Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN OPP
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWIGHT ALEXANDER
Represented By: Wallace C. Doolittle
Represented By: Barbara Louise Johnson
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARANGAL DOMINGO
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. NIELSEN
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMONE LAGOMARSINO
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELINDA GUZMAN
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN M. RILEY
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. WASLEY
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT C. SYPHAX
Represented By: Suzan Abebe
Represented By: Karen L. Corman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Spaziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. SIMONS
Represented By: Carla Denette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE H. PARKS
Represented By: Carla Denette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?