MURPHY v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: MAUREEN MURPHY
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Not Yet Classified: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00884
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Amend Complaint and Amended Complaint by MAUREEN MURPHY (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Motion)(Kennedy, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff must refile a corrected motion to amend #9 that notes that she is not just adding a new defendant but also a new plaintiff, and this should also be reflected in the caption of the amended complaint she seeks to file by June 21, 2019. The Court also directs plaintiff to Local Rule 5.1 which requires the pro se plaintiff she wishes to add to sign the pleadings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/11/2019. (lcabj3)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by MAUREEN MURPHY (Attachments: #1 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)(Kennedy, John)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike #8 defendant's initial disclosures from the docket. Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) provides that discovery shall be served on other counsel but not filed with the court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/31/19. (DMK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 05/31/19.....RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Engel, Jason) Modified on 5/31/2019 (jth).
May 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions to add parties shall be filed by 7/29/2019; Additional discovery requests shall be made by 8/5/2019. (jth)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. After a scheduling conference held on May 14, 2019 in Courtroom 3, and in light of the joint report submitted by the parties pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, it is ORDERED that: 1) Initial disclosures shall be produced no later than May 29, 2019. 2) Motions to add parties or amend pleading shall be filed no later than July 29, 2019. 3) Additional discovery requests shall be made by August 5, 2019. 4) Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2) statements must be produced by September 5, 2019. 5) Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2) statements must be produced by November 5, 2019. 6) All discovery must be completed by January 31, 2020. 7) A further status conference is scheduled for January 31, 2020 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 3. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/15/2019. (lcabj3)
May 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 5/14/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman). (jth)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Engel, Jason)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 5/7/2019. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g., "60 days after the entry of the scheduling order"). Counsel are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of court appearances. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/23/2019.(jth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Engel, Jason)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION.(Engel, Jason)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Kennedy, John)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028242) filed by MAUREEN MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kennedy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN MURPHY
Represented By: John F. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Jason R. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?