PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00888
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' #9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/25/2019. (lckbj1)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's #4 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/30/2019. (lckbj1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Intent to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 5/29/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/20/2019. (lckbj1)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lckbj1)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028395) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Declaration corporate disclosure, #3 Summons Navy Summons, #4 Summons AG Summons, #5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Paula Naomi Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?