DOE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: RAUL E. RODRIQUEZ VASQUEZ, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and RASIER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00903
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service to be effectuated upon party by 10/25/2019. (zjd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. The revised deadline for service of process shall be October 25, 2019. If the parties settle this dispute before that date, they shall promptly notify the court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/25/2019. (lcapm2)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by JANE DOE (Murray, Kasey)
June 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 6/26/2019. (zjd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to serve if Plaintiff does not serve on or before June 26, 2019. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/21/2019. (lcapm2)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Juli M. Porto on behalf of JANE DOE (Porto, Juli)
March 29, 2019 Summons (4) Issued as to RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, RAUL E. RODRIQUEZ VASQUEZ, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (jf)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, RAUL E. RODRIQUEZ VASQUEZ, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097362) with Jury Demand filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED Personal Information filed by JANE DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 03/29/2019. (see order for full detail) (jf)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jf) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAUL E. RODRIQUEZ VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-DC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Kasey Murray
Represented By: Juli M. Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?