ALLRED v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: SHERRI ALLRED
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00910
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion, ECF No. #8 . See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/14/2019. (lcapm2)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss. See attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/14/2019. (lcapm2)
April 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/27/2019. (zjd)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER advising Plaintiffs to respond by May 27, 2019, to Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/24/2019. (lcapm2)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Reed, Margaret)
April 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/4/2019. (zjd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Reed, Margaret)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re 1 Notice of Removal (zef, )
April 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLRED v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI ALLRED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?