MOBILE NOW, INC. v. SPRINT CORPORATION

Plaintiff: MOBILE NOW, INC.
Defendant: SPRINT CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00918
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CONSENT by MOBILE NOW, INC. re #30 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by SPRINT CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Roche, Sean)
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 Second MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by SPRINT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Fischman, Noam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by SPRINT CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
June 15, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Public Version of Exhibit 1 to the First Amended Complaint by MOBILE NOW, INC. re #28 Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint)(Roche, Sean)
June 13, 2019 Filing 33 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SPRINT CORPORATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #17 Sprint's motion to seal [2-2], [2-3], and [8-3], and denying as moot #2 Mobile Now's motion for leave to file documents under seal temporarily and #8 Sprint's motion for leave to file documents under seal. See text of Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/13/2019. (lcjdb2)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 6/11/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 6/11/2019. (tb)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #25 the parties' joint discovery plan and Rule 26(f) report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED nunc pro tunc that the parties shall exchange initial disclosures by not later than June 11, 2019. The Court will enter a scheduling order as to all other proposed discovery deadlines after resolution of #24 the pending motion to compel arbitration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/12/2019. (lcjdb2)
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Hearing by MOBILE NOW, INC. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #26 to view.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 Second MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Second MOTION to Compel Arbitration by SPRINT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Keen Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by SPRINT CORPORATION.(Fischman, Noam)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #8 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT CORPORATION filed by SPRINT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Consolidate reply due by 5/20/2019. (tb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Authorized Representative Agreement (Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order of 5/17/19) by SPRINT CORPORATION (ztd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE Authorized Representative Agreement (Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order of 5/17/19) by SPRINT CORPORATION (ztd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Exhibit 4 Sprint ID Scan Policy (Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order of 5/17/19) by MOBILE NOW, INC. (ztd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE Exhibit 3 Termination Notice (Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order of 5/17/19) by MOBILE NOW, INC. (ztd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #17 the parties' joint motion regarding the motions to seal, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal and file on the public docket [2-4] Exhibit 3 to plaintiff's motion to seal, [2-5] Exhibit 4 to plaintiff's motion to seal, [8-1] Exhibit A to defendant's motion to seal, and [8-2] Exhibit B to defendant's motion to seal; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall maintain under seal all other currently sealed exhibits; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a consolidated reply brief addressing the parties' remaining disputes concerning the sealing of documents in this matter by not later than May 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/17/2019. (lcjdb2)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Regarding Motions to Seal by SPRINT CORPORATION re #2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #8 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 15(a)(1) by MOBILE NOW, INC. re #15 Amended Complaint, #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPRINT CORPORATION with Jury Demand filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Roche, Sean)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT CORPORATION filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (Roche, Sean)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPRINT CORPORATION (Fischman, Noam)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by SPRINT CORPORATION.(Fischman, Noam)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by SPRINT CORPORATION. (Fischman, Noam)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay by SPRINT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant R. Gendron on behalf of SPRINT CORPORATION (Gendron, Grant)
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/29/2019. Response to #2 due by 4/29/2019. (tb)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #6 defendant's consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its response to the complaint, and any opposition to #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to file document under seal, by not later than April 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/19/2019. (lcjdb2)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Motion to Seal by SPRINT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Noam Barak Fischman on behalf of SPRINT CORPORATION (Fischman, Noam)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SPRINT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MOBILE NOW, INC. (Roche, Sean)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Roche, Sean)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOBILE NOW, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6034401) filed by MOBILE NOW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Roche, Sean) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/2/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOBILE NOW, INC. v. SPRINT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRINT CORPORATION
Represented By: Grant R. Gendron
Represented By: Noam Barak Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOBILE NOW, INC.
Represented By: Sean Patrick Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?