DEATLEY v. WEISER et al
Petitioner: ALAN DE ATLEY and ALAN DEATLEY
Respondent: WARDEN, COLORADO ATTORNEY GENERAL and PHILIP J. WEISER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00939
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Receipt on 05/08/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:19-cv-01326 sent by District of Colorado. (zrdj)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Colorado, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/17/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Colorado. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zsb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ALAN DE ATLEY (zsb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALAN DE ATLEY (zsb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ALAN DE ATLEY. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
April 1, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/01/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEATLEY v. WEISER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN DE ATLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN DEATLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COLORADO ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PHILIP J. WEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?