BROWN v. PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC, PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY and TRANSUNION LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00979
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 46 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burke, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 45 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re #43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (ztd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE re #42 MOTION for Sanctions filed by PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burke, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #39 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN. Fee Status: IFP granted in Superior Court. Parties have been notified. (ztd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Sanctions by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd)
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #36 due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiff's Response to #38 due by 8/19/2019. (dot)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order advising plaintiff to respond by August 12, 2019, to #36 Defendant Equifax's Motion to Dismiss and by August 19, 2019, to #38 Defendant PHEAA's Motion to Dismiss, or risk dismissal of the complaint against the moving defendant based on the assertions supporting its respective motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/9/19.(ah)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #32 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/9/19.(ah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Burke, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC. (Lankford, Taylor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC. (Lankford, Taylor)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT as to Familiarity with Local Rules by PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY. (Burke, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, upon the condition that counsel certify that he is familiar with the local rules of this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/28/19.(ah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas F. Burke, :Firm- Ballard Spahr LLP, :Address- 1735 Market Street 51st Floor, Philadelphia, PA. Phone No. - 215-864-8463. Fax No. - 215-864-8999 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6220963. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Panagopoulos, Constantinos) .
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Constantinos G. Panagopoulos on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY (Panagopoulos, Constantinos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS (8) Issued as to D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC., PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and District of Columbia Attorney General. (zmc)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying moot #26 Trans Union's Motion to Strike or for Discovery; granting #28 Experian's Motion for Joinder; denying #29 Plaintiff's Motion for Disclosure; denying #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; staying all discovery pending further order of the Court (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/31/19.(ah)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Disclosure by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 5/30/19 by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Joinder re #26 and Adoption of Defendant Trans Union, LLC's Motion to Strike Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 11) Or, In The Alternative, Allow Time for Parties to Conduct Discovery by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Irwin, Geoffrey) Modified to add link on 5/31/2019 (znmw).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Service; directing the court officers to prepare, issue, and serve process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), as to the defendants listed in the order (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/22/19.(ah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Allow Time For Parties To Conduct Discovery by TRANSUNION LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William M. Huse, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Huse, William). Added MOTION for Discovery on 5/17/2019 (ztd).
May 15, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(Irwin, Geoffrey)
May 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Trans Union and Experian Response to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/10/2019. (dot)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order issued separately this day, denying plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/14/19.(ah)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion for a TRO and Preliminary Injunction; denying #10 Plaintiff's motion to reschedule a hearing on said motion; directing defendants Trans Union and Experian to respond to plaintiff's summary judgment motion #11 by June 10, 2019, all for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/14/19.(ah) Modified on 5/14/2019 (ah).
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Order for Service by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Court Relief the Attached Subpoena of HUD & FTC Pursuant to 24 C.F.R. by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd); (See docket entry no. #20 to view.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a default judgment #17 is DENIED, as no defaults have been entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Additionally, the removing defendants, Trans Union, LLC, and Experian Information Solutions, Inc., have appeared in the case, and nothing in the record thus far contains a signature showing receipt of service upon the remaining defendants by a person appointed to accept service. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any deadlines for the defendants to respond to plaintiff's motions (current or future) that are unrelated to his pending TRO/PI motion are hereby suspended pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/19.(ah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Simmons, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Irwin, Geoffrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Irwin, Geoffrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey S Irwin on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Irwin, Geoffrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TRANSUNION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huse, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
April 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to #8 due by 5/2/2019. Reply to #8 due by 5/8/2019. (dot)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B Transunion Notices, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue rescheduling of hearing of TRO hearing pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 1450 regarding all orders pursuant to Granny Goose Food, Inc., et al v. Brotherhood of Teamster 415 U.S. 123 (1974) by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ztd) Modified event on 5/1/2019 (znmw).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/26/19.(ah)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Trans Union, LLC, and Experian Information Solutions, Inc., to respond to plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction [Dkt. 8] by Thursday, May 2, 2019, and giving plaintiff until Wednesday, May 8, 2019, to file any reply; directing plaintiff to file without delay proof that the remaining defendants received the TRO/PI motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/26/19.(ah)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN (ztd); ("Docket as a Motion for Temporary Injunction as Preliminary Injunction as it was docketed in Superior Court of the District of Columbia prior to the case being transferred to this court." signed 4/25/19 Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William M. Huse, :Firm- Schuckit & Associates, P.C., :Address- 4545 Northwestern Drive, Ziolsville, IN 46077. Phone No. - 317-363-2400. Fax No. - 317-363-2257 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6082656. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TRANSUNION LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Huse, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stichel, H.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TRANSUNION LLC.(Stichel, H.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN. (ztd)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/12/19. (DM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRANS UNION, LLC (Stichel, H.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 002157 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6047347 filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Summons, #2 Exhibit B -- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C -- Initial Order, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Information Sheet, #5 Exhibit E -- TRO Application, #6 Exhibit F - In formal pauperis application, #7 Exhibit G -- Experian Consent to Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stichel, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHUNTAY ANTONIO BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Geoffrey S Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: H. Mark Stichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION AGENCY
Represented By: Constantinos G. Panagopoulos
Represented By: Thomas F. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC.
Represented By: Taylor T. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSUNION LLC
Represented By: H. Mark Stichel
Represented By: William Madison Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?