PILLER POWER SYSTEMS, GMBH v. UNITED STATES

Plaintiff: Piller Power Systems, GmbH
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00987
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF ERROR re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney; emailed to jnanavati@kflaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The postal tracking must be filed. (ztd, ) Modified on 6/11/2019 (ztd).
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/7/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES served on 6/3/2019 (ztd); (See docket entry no. #7 to view.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2019. (Nanavati, Jay) Modified dates on 6/11/2019 (ztd).
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by PILLER POWER SYSTEMS, GMBH. (Nanavati, Jay)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/12/19. (DM)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with respect to Paul Butler, in order for him to appear as counsel for Plaintiffs, CONTINGENT on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than APRIL 22, 2019. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/11/2019. (lcckk3)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Butler, :Firm- Kostelantez & Fink LLP, :Address- 601 New Jersey Ave, Suite 620, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - 2028758000. Fax No. - 212-808-8108 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6051050. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Piller Power Systems, GmbH (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PILLER POWER SYSTEMS, GMBH. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6049164) filed by Piller Power Systems, GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, #8 Summons Summons)(Nanavati, Jay) (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/11/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PILLER POWER SYSTEMS, GMBH v. UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piller Power Systems, GmbH
Represented By: Jay R Nanavati
Represented By: Paul T. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?