CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH v. UNITED STATES
Plaintiff: CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00988
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES filed by CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH.(Nanavati, Jay)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2019. (Nanavati, Jay); Modified text on 6/10/2019 (tth).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Attorney Paul Butler is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/18/2019. (lctjk2)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice by CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay); Modified on 4/22/2019 to correct docket entry relationship and modified event. (tth).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Mr Butler does not categorically certify that he "either has or has not been disciplined by any bar" as required by LCvR 83.2(d)(4). Rather, he represents only that he is "currently in good standing" with all bars to which he is admitted. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/15/2019. (lctjk2)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Butler, :Firm- Kostelantez & Fink LLP, :Address- 601 New Jersey Ave, Suite 620, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - 202-875-8000. Fax No. - 212-808-8108 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6050975. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6049303) filed by CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration, #7 Summons)(Nanavati, Jay) (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/11/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH v. UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIUS PETERS GROUP, GMBH
Represented By: Jay R Nanavati
Represented By: Paul T. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?