SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC. v. MUSIC CHOICE

Plaintiff: SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC.
Defendant: MUSIC CHOICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00999
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) the plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion to transfer on or before July 22, 2019, and (2) the defendant shall file its reply on or before August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 1, 2019. (lcrbw3)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case by SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC. (Handzo, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by MUSIC CHOICE (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Paul Fakler, #3 Exhibit 1 to Fakler Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Fakler Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Fakler Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Fakler Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Fakler Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Fakler Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Fakler Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Fakler Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Fakler Declaration, #12 Declaration of David Del Beccaro, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Fakler, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MUSIC CHOICE.(Fakler, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUSIC CHOICE (Fakler, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Szego Fassbender on behalf of MUSIC CHOICE (Fassbender, Diana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC.. MUSIC CHOICE waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/22/2019. (Chapuis, Emily)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Lauren Chapuis on behalf of SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC. (Chapuis, Emily)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MUSIC CHOICE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC. (Handzo, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MUSIC CHOICE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6050688) filed by SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Handzo, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC. v. MUSIC CHOICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSIC CHOICE
Represented By: Paul M. Fakler
Represented By: Diana Szego Fassbender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUNDEXCHANGE, INC.
Represented By: David Andrew Handzo
Represented By: Emily Lauren Chapuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?