NYACK HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, NYACK HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS and BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01008
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 8/2/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(lsj)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 27 joint status report and the plaintiffs' 28 notice, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the case shall continue to be stayed. The government shall file its anticipated motion for consolidation on or before August 2, 2019. If the government's motion is granted, the parties shall take further action as directed in the consolidated case. Otherwise, the parties shall file a further joint status report within thirty days of any denial of the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01150-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC, 1:19-cv-01600-CRC(lccrc1)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #9 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and said pleading has been filed in the correct case. (ztd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(Orloff, Serena) Modified on 6/13/2019 (ztd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC(Orloff, Serena)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has before it fifteen cases that have been consolidated and stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. The Court directed the parties to file a joint status report within thirty (30) days of the Supreme Court's decision in that case. The Supreme Court issued its decision in Allina Health Services on June 3, 2019. So that it does not receive fifteen separate status reports, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a single consolidated joint status report reflecting the views of all plaintiffs in the consolidated case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC(lccrc1)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/30/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/22/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/21/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 25, 2019 Cases consolidated. Cases 19cv1008 and 18cv222 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 4/25/19. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead case, Civil Action No. 18-cv-222.. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd) Modified on 4/26/2019 (ztd).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case, 19-cv-1008, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. It is further ORDERED that the consolidated case will remain stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2019. (lccrc1)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, NYACK HOSPITAL, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL, ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-1613. (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6052000) filed by VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, NYACK HOSPITAL, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS, LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #3 Summons United States Attorney General, #4 Summons United States Attorney, #5 Exhibit 1)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NYACK HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYACK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?