LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER et al V. AZAR
Plaintiff: NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER and MERIT HEALTH RANKIN
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01014
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING ORDERS ISSUED IN SIMILAR CASES by ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER, #2 Text of Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ORDER)(Marcus, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' #13 Joint Status Report, the stay, and DIRECTING the parties to file a further joint status report by September 5, 2019, which status report shall propose a date for the filing of a motion to consolidate, unless such motion has been filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2019. (lcbah2)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (tg)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #12 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings; and DIRECTING the parties to file, within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 16, 2019. (lcbah2)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/18/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/18/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ re Order,,,, . (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiffs to show cause why Lehigh Regional Medical Center, et al. v. Azar, 19-cv-1014, should not be related to Allina Health Services, et al. v. Burwell, 14-cv-1415 (TJK), and Good Samaritan Hospital v. Azar, 19-cv-675 (TJK), in which plaintiffs also seek orders declaring the Secretary of Health and Human Services' calculation of Disproportionate Share Hospital ("DSH") payments for years prior to October 1, 2013 to be contrary to law because the Secretary's treatment of Medicare Part C days as Medicare Part A days in calculating DSH payments was required to undergo notice-and-comment rulemaking, pursuant to the Medicare Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1395hh(a)(2). Compare Alhambra Hospital and Medical Center v. Azar, 18-cv-590 (BAH), Complaint ¶¶ 42-43, 47 (filed Mar. 16, 2018), with Allina Health Services, et al. v. Burwell, 14-cv-1415 (TJK), Complaint ¶¶ 46-47, 53 (filed Aug. 19, 2014). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2019. (lcbah2)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 16, 2019. (lcbah2)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests REVISED by ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-1367. (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ALEX M AZAR II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6053993) filed by POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE, LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER, MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE, LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON, NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ, NMMC GILMORE - AMORY, JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH MADISON, MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL, BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE, RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY, JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST, BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #3 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #4 Summons United States Attorney, #5 Exhibit 1)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER et al V. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NMMC GILMORE - AMORY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE HEALTH SEMINOLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMC STRINGFELLO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HEALTH - VAN BUREN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS REGIONAL - PINE RIDGE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH WOMAN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVENTHEALTH DADE CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIVERVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH MADISON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGHLANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELBOURNE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCEHEALTH MIDWEST
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC PINNACLE LITITZ
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMESTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRSTHEALTH MOORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL-HAMLET
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH BILOXI
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-HARTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH NATCHEZ COMMUNITY CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT CLOUD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEHIGH REGIOINAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAFOLLETTE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWER KEYS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC PINNACLE CARLISLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HEALTH-FORT SMITH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWPORT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWIN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE HEALTH DURANT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLACKWELL REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKLEDGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH RANKIN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?