ZENEBE v. BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC et al

Plaintiff: MULUSHOA ZENEBE
Defendant: BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC, CUMMINS INC, BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC., BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC, CUMMINS INC. and BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01033
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, by MULUSHOA ZENEBE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Zukerberg, Paul)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by CUMMINS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CUMMINS INC. (Frederick, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint by CUMMINS INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by CUMMINS INC..(Frederick, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC. (Mistry, Armeen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC. (Mistry, Armeen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC (Mistry, Armeen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Count 1: Negligence of Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against CUMMINS INC. by BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC, BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC., BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Agreement between Boston Properties Limited Partnership and Cummins, Inc.)(Mistry, Armeen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2: Negligence Per Se to Plaintiff's Complaint by BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC., BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC., BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mistry, Armeen)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Defendant Cummins Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendant Cummins Inc. shall file its answer or response to plaintiff's complaint on or before July 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/10/19. (lcrjl1)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CUMMINS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, James)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Defendants BP 1330 Connecticut Avenue, LLC, Boston Properties Management, Inc., and Boston Properties, Inc.'s (BP Defendants) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that BP Defendants' answer or response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/28/19. (lcrjl1)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC., BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC., BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mistry, Armeen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Armeen Firoz Mistry on behalf of BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC., BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC., BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC (Mistry, Armeen)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC., BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC., BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC, CUMMINS INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zef, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC et. al. against MULUSHOA ZENEBE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6057661), CIVIL COVER SHEET by MULUSHOA ZENEBE filed by MULUSHOA ZENEBE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Zukerberg, Paul) Modified intro text on 4/15/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZENEBE v. BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Armeen Firoz Mistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP 1330 CONNECTICUT AVENUE, LLC
Represented By: Armeen Firoz Mistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS INC.
Represented By: James Albert Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Armeen Firoz Mistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULUSHOA ZENEBE
Represented By: Paul H. Zukerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?