HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, DANBURY HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, STAMFORD HOSPITAL and HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01038
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING ORDERS ISSUED IN SIMILAR CASES by ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, DANBURY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, STAMFORD HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, DANBURY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, STAMFORD HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER, #2 Text of Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ORDER)(Marcus, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' #16 Joint Status Report, the stay, and DIRECTING the parties to file a further joint status report by September 5, 2019, which status report shall propose a date for the filing of a motion to consolidate, unless such motion has been filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2019. (lcbah2)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (tg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #15 Joint Motion to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint; VACATING the deadline for the Secretary to respond to the second amended complaint; and DIRECTING the parties to file, by July 3, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings in this case in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Allina Health Services, et al. v. Azar, 139 S. Ct. 1804 (2019). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 17, 2019. (lcbah2)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of All Defendants (Orloff, Serena)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 16, 2019. (lcbah2)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/22/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/19/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/18/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, DANBURY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, STAMFORD HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL re Order,,,, . (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, DANBURY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NORWALK HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit Comparison)(Marcus, Kenneth)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiffs to show cause why Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center, et al. v. Azar, 19-cv-1038, should not be related to Allina Health Services, et al. v. Burwell, 14-cv-1415 (TJK), and Good Samaritan Hospital v. Azar, 19-cv-675 (TJK), in which plaintiffs also seek orders declaring the Secretary of Health and Human Services' calculation of Disproportionate Share Hospital ("DSH") payments for years prior to October 1, 2013 to be contrary to law because the Secretary's treatment of Medicare Part C days as Medicare Part A days in calculating DSH payments was required to undergo notice-and-comment rulemaking, pursuant to the Medicare Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1395hh(a)(2). Compare Alhambra Hospital and Medical Center v. Azar, 18-cv-590 (BAH), Complaint ¶¶ 42-43, 47 (filed Mar. 16, 2018), with Allina Health Services, et al. v. Burwell, 14-cv-1415 (TJK), Complaint ¶¶ 46-47, 53 (filed Aug. 19, 2014). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2019. (lcbah2)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to non-parties, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF EXHIBITS 6 AND 7 AND COMPARISON OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, DANBURY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit Comparison Of Complaint)(Marcus, Kenneth)
April 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, DANBURY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NORWALK HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 8)(Marcus, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-1367. (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, DANBURY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, NORWALK HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Marcus, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6057918) filed by JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA, HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER, DANBURY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, HARTFORD HOSPITAL, MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL, INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL, THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT, MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER, NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, WATERBURY HOSPITAL, MCG MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL, THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER, OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER, HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER, LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL, OAKLAWN HOSPITAL, THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COXHEALTH, LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL, PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER, NORWALK HOSPITAL, HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL, #3 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Summons)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONGMONT UNITED HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK DOWNTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE STAMFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANBURY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORWALK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFICA HOSPITAL OF THE VALLEY CORPORATION
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEBRASKA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABBEVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERBURY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAMILTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIZONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-MESA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINTER HAVEN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLYWOOD PRESBYTERINAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE & MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CLOUD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ALEXISMEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LANNING MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPE FEAR MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. ARCHBOLD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OAKLAWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COXHEALTH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STORMONT-VAIL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WUESTHOFF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THIBODAUX REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OZARKS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAPLES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARKIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METHODIST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEART HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCG MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DEMPSEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. BACKUS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAMFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL OF CENTRAL CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?