TUCKER v. BBVA COMPASS BANK et al
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. TUCKER
Defendant: CEDRIC BROWN, BBVA COMPASS BANK, CHARLES C. GUIMM, III, WALTER IRVIN, RAY MCDONALD and CEDRIC BROOKS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01044
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Receipt on 05/20/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:19-cv-01213 sent by Northern District of Texas. (zrdj)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/30/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zrdj)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/29/2019. (zsb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDDIE L. TUCKER (zsb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by EDDIE L. TUCKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(zsb)
April 12, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/12/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUCKER v. BBVA COMPASS BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDRIC BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA COMPASS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES C. GUIMM, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER IRVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDRIC BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. TUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?