TRUMP et al v. COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by Donald Trump against the Democrats of the U.S. House of Representatives in order to stop the subpoena of Trump's tax records.

Plaintiff: DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC and TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.
Defendant: ELIJAH E. CUMMINGS, PETER KENNY and MAZARS USA LLP
Petitioner: DUANE MORLEY COX
Intervenor Defendant: COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Interested Party: HOMER DOUGLAS COBB, IV
Case Number: 1:2019cv01136
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 41 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notice of Filing submitted by Christophe De La Mar Chapman. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied. Case Closed" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/24/2019. (jf)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #40 Motion to Delay Decision as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2019. (lcapm3)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #39 Motion to Consolidate Related Cases for Trial as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/30/2019. (lcapm3)
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Consolidate Related Cases For Trial by HOMER DOUGLAS COBB, IV. "LET THIS BE FILED" signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/28/2019 (jf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Delay Decision by DUANE MORLEY COX (jf)
May 21, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5142 for #37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DJT HOLDINGS LLC. (zrdj)
May 21, 2019 Filing 38 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #35 Order, #36 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-6135794. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Consovoy, William)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the #35 Memorandum Opinion, the court enters judgment in favor of the House Oversight Committee and against Plaintiffs. Please see the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/20/2019. (lcapm3)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION entering judgment in favor of the House Oversight Committee and against Plaintiffs. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/20/2019. (lcapm3) Modified document type on 5/21/2019 (zjd).
May 17, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT Second Supplemental Declaration of William S. Consovoy by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF ORAL ARGUMENT PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on May 14, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-93. Date of Issuance: May 14, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court re porter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019.(wz)
May 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Oral Argument held on 5/14/2019 re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Motion by Intervenor Defendant for summary judgment on the pleadings. The record will be open until 5/18/2019. Intervenor Defendant's In-Camera Submission due by 5/16/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Morse, Josephine)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The hearing will proceed tomorrow as scheduled. During the hearing, the court will take up the objections to its #25 Consolidation Order made in Plaintiffs' #29 Response to Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/13/2019. (lcapm3)
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #25 Order filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT Supplemental Declaration of William S. Consovoy by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #25 Order filed by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Brief by DUANE MORLEY COX (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence H. Wechsler on behalf of MAZARS USA LLP (Wechsler, Lawrence)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jerry D. Bernstein is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Mazars USA LLP. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/10/2019. (lcapm3)
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jerry D. Bernstein, :Firm- Blank Rome LLP, :Address- 1271 Avenue of the Americas. Phone No. - (212) 885-5511. Fax No. - (917) 332-3766 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6116867. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MAZARS USA LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jerry D. Bernstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order Bernstein Decl. Ex. A (Proposed Order))(Schuelke, Henry)
May 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections and/or Supplemental Memoranda due by 5/13/2019 at 5:00 pm. (zjd)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER notifying the parties that the court intends to advance #11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction to trial on the merits. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/09/2019. (lcapm3)
May 8, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MAZARS USA LLP. (Schuelke, Henry)
May 1, 2019 Filing 22 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MAZARS USA LLP (Schuelke, Henry)
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Frederick Schuelke, III on behalf of MAZARS USA LLP (Schuelke, Henry)
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greta G. Gao, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Greta G. Gao, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Greta G. Gao)(Letter, Douglas)
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Hanner, Brooks)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Barbero, Megan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, DJT HOLDINGS LLC. MAZARS USA LLP waiver sent on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Consovoy, William)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion to have Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives Intervene as Defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/29/2019. (lcapm3)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
April 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Oppositions due by 5/1/2019. Replies due by 5/8/2019. Oral Argument for 5/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the parties' joint scheduling submission, the court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Intervenor-Defendant Committee on Oversight and Reform agrees to postpone the return date on its subpoena to Mazars USA, LLP until seven days after the court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Intervenor-Defendant Committee on Oversight and Reform's and Mazars USA LLP's Opposition(s), if any, shall be filed by Wednesday, May 1, 2019. Plaintiffs' Replies shall be filed by May 8, 2019. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 14, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. In addition, in light of the parties' agreed-upon schedule, Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Shorten Time, ECF No. 10, is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. 9, is likewise denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2019. (lcapm3)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William S. Consovoy, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Order Shortening Defendants' Time to Respond to TRO Application by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William S. Consovoy, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Local Rule 65.1(a) Certificate of Counsel)(Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DJT HOLDINGS LLC (Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ELIJAH E. CUMMINGS, PETER KENNY, MAZARS USA LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP CORPORATION (Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Mazars USA LLP filed by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, DJT HOLDINGS LLC.(Consovoy, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6072689) filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Elijah E. Cummings, #3 Summons for Peter Kenny)(Consovoy, William) Modified to add "All Plaintiffs" on 4/22/2019 (zef, ).
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6072689) filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Elijah E. Cummings, # 3 Summons for Peter Kenny)(Consovoy, William) Modified to add "All Plaintiffs" on 4/22/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUMP et al v. COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUMP CORPORATION
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJT HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIJAH E. CUMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZARS USA LLP
Represented By: Jerry Daniel Bernstein
Represented By: Lawrence H. Wechsler
Represented By: Henry Frederick Schuelke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Brooks McKinly Hanner
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DUANE MORLEY COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HOMER DOUGLAS COBB, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?