KINARD v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: ERNEST MILTON KINARD
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01144
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2019. (Campbell, Curt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/14/19. (Campbell, Curt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 5/8/2019 (Campbell, Curt)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee for this case has been paid. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/10/2019. (lcrmc1)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERNEST MILTON KINARD (Campbell, Curt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by ERNEST MILTON KINARD. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by ERNEST MILTON KINARD.(Campbell, Curt)
April 26, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Report and Recommendation. (zad)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/26/2019. (lcrmc1)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Heuer Levy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Levy, Jonathan)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certification Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(g) by ERNEST MILTON KINARD (Mezey, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer F. Mezey on behalf of ERNEST MILTON KINARD (Mezey, Jennifer)
April 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zef, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Certification Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(g) by ERNEST MILTON KINARD re #2 Notice of Appearance (Campbell, Curt)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt D. Campbell, Jr on behalf of ERNEST M KINARD (Campbell, Curt)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL in her official capacity as Comm'r of SSA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6074201) filed by ERNEST M KINARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Campbell, Curt) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/22/2019) (zef, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/22/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINARD v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST MILTON KINARD
Represented By: Curt D. Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Jonathan Heuer Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?