OWENS v. BANK OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: SONYA OWENS
Defendant: HARVEY WEST AUCTIONEERS, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, RELIANCE GROUP LLC and SAMUEL I. WHITE PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01161
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re #6 Notice of Appeal. (zmc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Memorandum & Opinion, #4 Order by SONYA OWENS. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (zmc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Memorandum & Opinion, #4 Order by SONYA OWENS (zmc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis [Dkt. #2] is GRANTED, and the complaint an this case are DISMISSED with prejudice. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/2019. (zad)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/2019. (zad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SONYA OWENS (zrdj)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA, HARVEY WEST AUCTIONEERS, INC., RELIANCE GROUP LLC, SAMUEL I. WHITE PC filed by SONYA OWENS.(zrdj)
April 23, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/23/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. BANK OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY WEST AUCTIONEERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANCE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL I. WHITE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONYA OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?