LUHN v. SCOTT et al

Plaintiff: LAURA WILLIS LUHN
Defendant: SUZANNE SCOTT and FOX CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by FOX CORPORATION, SUZANNE SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Luhn L.A. Complaint)(Carvin, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Amended filed by LAURA WILLIS LUHN. (Klayman, Larry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by LAURA WILLIS LUHN. (Klayman, Larry)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file any opposition to the defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss on or before June 24, 2019 and the defendants shall file any reply on or before July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 31, 2019. (lcdlf1) Modified on 6/6/2019 (zcal).
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by LAURA WILLIS LUHN (Klayman, Larry)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by FOX CORPORATION, SUZANNE SCOTT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (L.A. Times Article), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOX CORPORATION (Carvin, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Dick on behalf of All Defendants (Dick, Anthony)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Carvin on behalf of All Defendants (Carvin, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOX CORPORATION served on 5/14/2019; answer due 6/4/2019; SUZANNE SCOTT served on 5/15/2019; answer due 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry); Modified text on 5/20/2019 (tth).
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FOX CORPORATION, SUZANNE SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6078068) filed by LAURA WILLIS LUHN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/24/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUHN v. SCOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA WILLIS LUHN
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE SCOTT
Represented By: Anthony J. Dick
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX CORPORATION
Represented By: Anthony J. Dick
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?