BUTINA et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: FREDERICK BANKS and MARINA BUTINA
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01210
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/16/2019. (zmc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01303. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT CASE IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1631 TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/18/19. 4/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SES.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/25/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARINA BUTINA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/25/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by MARINA BUTINA..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTINA et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FREDERICK BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARINA BUTINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?