PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT
Plaintiff: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT and RYAN CARTWRIGHT
Case Number: 1:2019cv01212
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Case Remanded to Superior Court re Minute Order filed on 5/17/2019. (tth)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's #5 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. It says nothing about the timeliness of removal, which was the basis of the Court's remand Order. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/31/2019. (lcjeb3)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration, by RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT (ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 5/29/19 by Judge James E. Boasberg)
May 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 5/27/2019. (znbn)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On April 29, 2019, the Court issued a Minute Order requiring Defendant to show cause by May 13, 2019, why the case should not be remanded to Superior Court for failure to timely remove it here. As he has filed no response, and as his removal was plainly late under 28 U.S.C. 1446(b), the Court ORDERS that the case is REMANDED to the Superior Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/17/2019. (lcjeb3)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC (Solan, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Solan, David); Modified event and text on 5/9/2019 (tth).
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solan, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT re #1 Notice of Removal. "Leave to file GRANTED [Link to Notice of Removal]" by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/19. (tth)
April 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause due by 5/13/2019. (znbn)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As Defendant filed his Answer in Superior Court on March 4, 2019, and then his #1 Notice of Removal here on April 29, 2019, the Court ORDERS that he shall show cause by May 13, 2019, why the case should not be remanded to Superior Court on the basis on an untimely removal. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/29/2019. (lcjeb3)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT from District of Columbia Superior Court Civil Division, case number 2019 C 000509 R (RP). (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097783) filed by RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN D. CARTWRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN CARTWRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Howard N. Bierman
Represented By: David Edwin Solan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?